EP3302493 - INHIBITORS OF CYSTINE-GLUTAMATE TRANSPORTER FOR USE IN TREATING OR PREVENTING SUBSTANCE-RELATED AND ADDICTIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/15] | NEW USE OF INHIBITOR OF CYSTINE-GLUTAMATE TRANSPORTER | ||
[2021/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Medical University No. 91, Hsueh-Shih Road North District Taichung 40402 / TW | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSIEH, Chia-hung No.91 Hsueh-shih Road Taichung 40402 / TW | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/27] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2018/15] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16802610.2 | 06.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016CN85002 | Priority number, date | US201562171315P | 05.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562171315 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016192687 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3302493 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3302493 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44, A61K31/4402, A61K31/655, A61K31/63, A61K45/06, A61P25/36, A61P25/32 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
A61K31/4402 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/655 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61P25/32 (EP,US);
A61P25/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | A61K31/63, A61K31/44, A61P25/36, A61P25/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN DES CYSTIN-GLUTAMAT-TRANSPORTERS ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER BEHANDLUNG ODER VORBEUGUNG VON SUBSTANZBEZOGENEN STÖRUNGEN UND SUCHTERKRANKUNGEN | [2021/08] | English: | INHIBITORS OF CYSTINE-GLUTAMATE TRANSPORTER FOR USE IN TREATING OR PREVENTING SUBSTANCE-RELATED AND ADDICTIVE DISORDERS | [2021/08] | French: | INHIBITEURS DU TRANSPORTEUR DE CYSTINE-GLUTAMATE POUR LE TRAITEMENT OU LA PRÉVENTION DE TROUBLES LIÉS AUX SUBSTANCES ET DE TROUBLES DE DÉPENDANCE | [2021/08] |
Former [2018/15] | NEUE VERWENDUNG EINES INHIBITORS DES CYSTIN-GLUTAMAT-TRANSPORTERS | ||
Former [2018/15] | NEW USE OF INHIBITOR OF CYSTINE-GLUTAMATE TRANSPORTER | ||
Former [2018/15] | NOUVELLE UTILISATION D'UN INHIBITEUR DU TRANSPORTEUR CYSTINE-GLUTAMATE | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 19.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.05.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.06.2016 | AL | 07.07.2021 | AT | 07.07.2021 | CY | 07.07.2021 | CZ | 07.07.2021 | DK | 07.07.2021 | EE | 07.07.2021 | ES | 07.07.2021 | FI | 07.07.2021 | HR | 07.07.2021 | IT | 07.07.2021 | LT | 07.07.2021 | LV | 07.07.2021 | MC | 07.07.2021 | MK | 07.07.2021 | MT | 07.07.2021 | NL | 07.07.2021 | PL | 07.07.2021 | RO | 07.07.2021 | RS | 07.07.2021 | SE | 07.07.2021 | SI | 07.07.2021 | SK | 07.07.2021 | SM | 07.07.2021 | BG | 07.10.2021 | NO | 07.10.2021 | GR | 08.10.2021 | IS | 07.11.2021 | PT | 08.11.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 06.06.2016 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
MK | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 06.06.2016 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CY | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 06.06.2016 | |
AL | 07.07.2021 | ||
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
MC | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
IT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 07.07.2021 | |
AT | 07.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SI | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
SM | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
CZ | 07.07.2021 | ||
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
EE | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RO | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
SK | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
DK | 07.07.2021 | ||
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
HR | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
LV | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
PL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
GR | 08.10.2021 | ||
IS | 07.11.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
RS | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
PT | 08.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
ES | 07.07.2021 | ||
FI | 07.07.2021 | ||
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
SE | 07.07.2021 | ||
BG | 07.10.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 07.07.2021 | |
LT | 07.07.2021 | ||
NL | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2007084541 (UNIV COLORADO [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8 * page 15 *; | [X]WO2008042795 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [X] 1-7,9,11,14,15 * page 7, lines 25-26 * * page 14, lines 2-4, 22-25 * * examples 2, 3, 5 * * claims 1, 2, 10, 12-16, 23, 24, 26 *; | [XI] - DAVID A BAKER ET AL, "Neuroadaptations in cystine-glutamate exchange underlie cocaine relapse", NATURE NEUROSCI, NATURE AMERICA, INC, US, (20030601), vol. 6, doi:10.1038/NN1069, ISSN 1097-6256, pages 743 - 749, XP008132286 [X] 1-7,11,14,15 * abstract * * page 745, column 1, paragraph 2 * * figures 3, 5 * * page 746, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 747, column 1, paragraph 1 * [I] 8-10,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn1069 | [I] - Anonymous, "Effects of Sulfasalazine on BOLD Response to Alcohol Cues", (20140922), GlinicalTrials.gov, URL: https://clinicaltrials.gov/ct2/show/record/NCT01312129, (20181207), XP002787247 [I] 1-15 * Current primary outcome measures; page 1 * * Brief summary; pages 2-3 * * page 5, paragraph 2 * * Intervention; page 6 * | [A] - ALESSANDRA T. PEANA ET AL, "Change of cystine/glutamate antiporter expression in ethanol-dependent rats", FRONTIERS IN NEUROSCIENCE, (20141006), vol. 8, doi:10.3389/fnins.2014.00311, XP055531895 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 5, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 6, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 7, column 2, paragraph 1 * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnins.2014.00311 | [XPI] - DHAVAL PATEL ET AL, "Emerging roles of system antiporter and its inhibition in CNS disorders", MOLECULAR MEMBRANE BIOLOGY., GB, (20151027), vol. 32, no. 4, doi:10.3109/09687688.2015.1096972, ISSN 0968-7688, pages 89 - 116, XP055531897 [XP] 1-7,11,14,15 * page 95, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 99, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 99, column 2, paragraphs 1, 4 * * pages 100-102; table 2 * * page 104; table 2 * * page 110; table 2 * [I] 8,12,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/09687688.2015.1096972 | International search | [X]WO2007084541 (UNIV COLORADO [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * see description, page 15 *; | [A]WO2014197536 (UNIV TEMPLE [US]) [A] 1-18* see description, paragraph [032] *; | [A]WO2015070034 (PROMENTIS PHARM INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * see description, paragraph [008] * | Examination | - BRIDGES RICHARD J ET AL, "System xc- cystine/glutamate antiporter: an update on molecular pharmacology and roles within the CNS", BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (201201), vol. 165, no. 1, ISSN 0007-1188, pages 20 - 34 | - Statistical Analysis of the results presented in "Effects of Sulfasalazine on BOLD Response to Alcohol Cues" | - EVANS SUZETTE M ET AL, "A pilot double-blind treatment trial of memantine for alcohol dependence", ALCOHOLISM CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL RESEARCH, (200705), vol. 31, no. 5, ISSN 0145-6008, pages 775 - 782 | - MUIR ALEXANDER ET AL, "Environmental cystine drives glutamine anaplerosis and sensitizes cancer cells to glutaminase inhibition", ELIFE, (20170815), vol. 6, ISSN 2050-084X | - TOMI MASATOSHI ET AL, "Induction of xCT gene expression and L-cystine transport activity by diethyl maleate at the inner blood-retinal barrier", IOVS, (200203), vol. 43, no. 3, pages 774 - 779 | - Anonymous, "Azulfidine EN-tabs", (20121201), pages 1 - 21, URL: https://www.accessdata.fda.gov/drugsatfda_docs/label/2012/007073s125lbl.pdf, (20200721), XP055716661 | - Anonymous, "Sulfasalazine", NCBI Bookshelf, (20170925), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/books/NBK548792/, (20200721), XP055716660 | - SABHA MUSHTAQ ET AL, "Sulfasalazine in dermatology: A lesser explored drug with broad therapeutic potential", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF WOMEN'S DERMATOLOGY, (20200601), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.ijwd.2020.01.009, ISSN 2352-6475, pages 191 - 198, XP055716667 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijwd.2020.01.009 | by applicant | - TZSCHENTKE, T.M.W.J. SCHMIDT, "Glutamatergic mechanisms in addiction", Mol Psychiatry, (20030000), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 373 - 82 | - DING, Z.M. et al., "Alcohol drinking and deprivation alter basal extracellular glutamate concentrations and clearance in the mesolimbic system of alcohol-preferring (P) rats", Addict Biol, (20130000), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 297 - 306 | - WILLIAMS, J.M., J.D. STEKETEE, "Steketee, Cocaine increases medial prefrontal cortical glutamate overflow in cocaine-sensitized rats: a time course study", Eur J Neurosci, (20040000), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 1639 - 46 | - SAELLSTROEM BAUM, S. et al., "Nicotine stimulation on extracellular glutamate levels in the nucleus accumbens of ethanol-withdrawn rats in vivo", Alcohol Clin Exp Res, (20060000), vol. 30, no. 8, pages 1414 - 21 | - MOGHADDAM, B. et al., "Activation of glutamatergic neurotransmission by ketamine: a novel step in the pathway from NMDA receptor blockade to dopaminergic and cognitive disruptions associated with the prefrontal cortex", J Neurosci, (19970000), vol. 17, no. 8, pages 2921 - 7 | - DEL ARCO, A. et al., "Amphetamine increases the extracellular concentration of glutamate in striatum of the awake rat: involvement of high affinity transporter mechanisms", Neuropharmacology, (19990000), vol. 38, no. 7, pages 943 - 54 | - PETERS, J.T.J. DE VRIES, "Glutamate mechanisms underlying opiate memories", Cold Spring Harb Perspect Med, (20120000), vol. 2, no. 9, page a012088 | - GONZALES, R.A.J.N. JAWORSKI, "Alcohol and glutamate", Alcohol Health Res World, (19970000), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 120 - 7 | - BRIDGES, R.J.N.R. NATALES.A. PATEL, "System xc(-) cystine/glutamate antiporter: an update on molecular pharmacology and roles within the CNS", Br JPharmacol, (20120000), vol. 165, no. 1, doi:10.1111/j.1476-5381.2011.01480.x, pages 20 - 34, XP055247839 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1476-5381.2011.01480.x | - SATO, H. et al., "Cloning and expression of a plasma membrane cystine/glutamate exchange transporter composed of two distinct proteins.", J Biol Chem, (19990000), vol. 274, no. 17, doi:10.1074/jbc.274.17.11455, pages 11455 - 8, XP002941607 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.274.17.11455 | - BUCKINGHAM, S.C. et al., "Glutamate release by primary brain tumors induces epileptic activity", Nat Med, (20110000), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 1269 - 74 | - ALBRECHT, P. et al., "Mechanisms of oxidative glutamate toxicity: the glutamate/cystine antiporter system xc- as a neuroprotective drug target", CNS Neurol Disord Drug Targets, (20100000), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 373 - 82 | - DE BUNDEL, D. et al., "Loss of system x(c)- does not induce oxidative stress but decreases extracellular glutamate in hippocampus and influences spatial working memory and limbic seizure susceptibility", J Neurosci, (20110000), vol. 31, no. 15, pages 5792 - 803 | - BAKER, D.A., et al., "Neuroadaptations in cystine-glutamate exchange underlie cocaine relapse", Nat Neurosci, (20030000), vol. 6, no. 7, doi:10.1038/nn1069, pages 743 - 9, XP008132286 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nn1069 | - KNACKSTEDT, L.A., et al., "The role of cystine-glutamate exchange in nicotine dependence in rats and humans", Biol Psychiatry, (20090000), vol. 65, no. 10, doi:10.1016/j.biopsych.2008.10.040, pages 841 - 5, XP026056813 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.biopsych.2008.10.040 | - PEANA, A. T.G. MUGGIRONIF. BENNARDINI, "Change of cystine/glutamate antiporter expression in ethanol-dependent rats", Front Neurosci, (20140000), vol. 8, page 311 | - LEWERENZ, J. et al., "The cystine/glutamate antiporter system x(c)(~) in health and disease: from molecular mechanisms to novel therapeutic opportunities", Antioxid Redox Signal, (20130000), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:10.1089/ars.2011.4391, pages 522 - 55, XP055592843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/ars.2011.4391 | - BAKER et al., Nature Neuroscience, (20030000), vol. 6, no. 7, pages 743 - 749 | - PEANA et al., Frontiers In Neuroscience, (20140000), vol. 8, no. 311 | - PATEL et al., Moi. Membr. Biol., (20150000), vol. 32, no. 4, pages 89 - 116 | - SHYU, W.C., et al., "Secretoneurin promotes neuroprotection and neuronal plasticity via the Jak2/Stat3 pathway in murine models of stroke", J Clin Invest, (20080000), vol. 118, no. 1, pages 133 - 48 | - CHUNG, W.J. et al., "Inhibition of cystine uptake disrupts the growth of primary brain tumors", J Neurosci, (20050000), vol. 25, no. 31, pages 7101 - 10 |