EP3304255 - IMAGE CLASSIFICATION BY BRAIN COMPUTER INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innereye Ltd. 14 Maskit Street P.O. Box 12952 4673316 Herzeliya Pituach / IL | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEVA, Amir B. 4/9 Max Brod Street 6962131 Tel-Aviv / IL | 02 /
DEOUELL, Leon Y. 22 Michal Street 6326135 Tel-Aviv / IL | 03 /
VAISMAN, Sergey 83 Bialik Street 5251302 Ramat-Gan / IL | 04 /
HARISH, Omri 15 Arbel Street 4486200 Zur Yigal / IL | 05 /
MANOR, Ran El 3 HaIrus Street 5690500 Savyon / IL | 06 /
NETZER, Eitan 3 Hertzel Street 3609103 Kiryat-Tivon / IL | 07 /
SHALGI, Shani 2 Heshvan Street 4521934 Hod-HaSharon / IL | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Gauchet, Fabien Roland Brandon IP 64, rue Tiquetonne 75002 Paris / FR | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16802693.8 | 02.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016IL50569 | Priority number, date | IL20150239191 | 03.06.2015 Original published format: IL 23919115 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016193979 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3304255 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06T7/00, G06K9/62, G06K9/00, G06N3/04, G06N3/08, G06N7/00, G06K9/46 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
G06F3/015 (EP,US);
A61B5/1103 (US);
A61B5/316 (US);
A61B5/378 (US);
A61B5/486 (US);
A61B5/7264 (US);
G06F18/2135 (US);
G06F18/2413 (US);
G06F18/24137 (US);
G06F3/01 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/088 (EP,US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/454 (EP,US);
G06V10/763 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/7715 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G16H20/70 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
A61B5/24 (US);
G06F2218/00 (US);
G06F2218/12 (EP,US);
G06N20/10 (EP,US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G06N7/01 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | G06F3/01, G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | BILDKLASSIFIZIERUNG DURCH GEHIRN-COMPUTER-SCHNITTSTELLE | [2018/15] | English: | IMAGE CLASSIFICATION BY BRAIN COMPUTER INTERFACE | [2018/15] | French: | CLASSIFICATION D'IMAGE PAR INTERFACE CERVEAU-ORDINATEUR | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 02.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2009150821 (MATHAN SANTOSH [US]) [AD] 2 * figure 2 * * figure 5 *; | [XYI] - WANG YUN ET AL, "A closed-loop system for rapid face retrieval by combining EEG and computer vision", 2015 7TH INTERNATIONAL IEEE/EMBS CONFERENCE ON NEURAL ENGINEERING (NER), IEEE, (20150422), doi:10.1109/NER.2015.7146577, pages 130 - 133, XP033166181 [X] 1,3-5,15 * the whole document * [Y] 13,14 [I] 2 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/NER.2015.7146577 | [X] - KAPOOR A ET AL, "Combining brain computer interfaces with vision for object categorization", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 2008. CVPR 2008. IEEE CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080623), ISBN 978-1-4244-2242-5, pages 1 - 8, XP031297176 [X] 1-4,15 * the whole document * | [X] - KOELSTRA S ET AL, "EEG analysis for implicit tagging of video data", AFFECTIVE COMPUTING AND INTELLIGENT INTERACTION AND WORKSHOPS, 2009. ACII 2009. 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20090910), ISBN 978-1-4244-4800-5, pages 1 - 6, XP031577771 [X] 1,6-9,15 * the whole document * | [IY] - A.D. GERSON ET AL, "Cortically Coupled Computer Vision for Rapid Image Search", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL SYSTEMS AND REHABILITATIONENGINEERING., US, (20060601), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TNSRE.2006.875550, ISSN 1534-4320, pages 174 - 179, XP055537809 [I] 1-3,10,15 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNSRE.2006.875550 | [Y] - CECOTTI HUBERT ET AL, "Single-Trial Classification of Event-Related Potentials in Rapid Serial Visual Presentation Tasks Using Supervised Spatial Filtering", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS AND LEARNING SYSTEMS, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, vol. 25, no. 11, doi:10.1109/TNNLS.2014.2302898, ISSN 2162-237X, (20141101), pages 2030 - 2042, (20141015), XP011561363 [Y] 11,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TNNLS.2014.2302898 | [Y] - MERCIER-GANADY JONATHAN ET AL, "The Mind-Mirror: See your brain in action in your head using EEG and augmented reality", 2014 IEEE VIRTUAL REALITY (VR), IEEE, (20140329), doi:10.1109/VR.2014.6802047, pages 33 - 38, XP032589950 [Y] 13,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VR.2014.6802047 | [A] - Angela T Chan ET AL, "An Overview of Brain Computer Interfaces", (20150309), URL: https://pdfs.semanticscholar.org/7423/c275d0393f52e11d96e377f4188e3df9ef19.pdf, (20181221), XP055537805 [A] 1-5,15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2011238685 (GARCIA MOLINA GARY NELSON [NL], et al) [A] 1-104* the whole document *; | [A]US2012022343 (SHASTRI ANANDA [US], et al) [A] 1-104 * paragraphs [0104], [0106], [0176]-[0177] *; | [A]WO2014142962 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-104 * the whole document * |