EP3306837 - COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2022 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMANO, Sho c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16802967.6 | 28.04.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016JP63361 | Priority number, date | JP20150111818 | 02.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015111818 | [2018/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016194530 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306837 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3306837 | Date: | 22.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04B13/00 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H04B13/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2018/15] | English: | COMMUNICATION APPARATUS, COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2018/15] | French: | APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION, SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROGRAMME | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2017 | Translation filed | 23.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 23.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.11.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.04.2016 | AL | 22.12.2021 | AT | 22.12.2021 | CY | 22.12.2021 | CZ | 22.12.2021 | DK | 22.12.2021 | EE | 22.12.2021 | ES | 22.12.2021 | FI | 22.12.2021 | HR | 22.12.2021 | IT | 22.12.2021 | LT | 22.12.2021 | LV | 22.12.2021 | MC | 22.12.2021 | MK | 22.12.2021 | PL | 22.12.2021 | RO | 22.12.2021 | RS | 22.12.2021 | SE | 22.12.2021 | SI | 22.12.2021 | SK | 22.12.2021 | SM | 22.12.2021 | TR | 22.12.2021 | BG | 22.03.2022 | NO | 22.03.2022 | GR | 23.03.2022 | IS | 22.04.2022 | PT | 22.04.2022 | GB | 28.04.2022 | IE | 28.04.2022 | LU | 28.04.2022 | BE | 30.04.2022 | CH | 30.04.2022 | FR | 30.04.2022 | LI | 30.04.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 28.04.2016 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
MK | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 28.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 28.04.2016 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CY | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 28.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 28.04.2016 | |
AL | 22.12.2021 | ||
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 28.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
IT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 28.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 28.04.2022 | ||
IE | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SI | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
BE | 30.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
CH | 30.04.2022 | ||
FR | 30.04.2022 | ||
LI | 30.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
GB | 28.04.2022 | ||
LU | 28.04.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
MC | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 22.12.2021 | |
AT | 22.12.2021 | ||
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
DK | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IS | 22.04.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 22.12.2021 | |
CZ | 22.12.2021 | ||
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
PL | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | CZ | 22.12.2021 | |
EE | 22.12.2021 | ||
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SK | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | EE | 22.12.2021 | |
ES | 22.12.2021 | ||
FI | 22.12.2021 | ||
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RO | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
PT | 22.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
SM | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
NO | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
HR | 22.12.2021 | ||
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
LV | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
SE | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
GR | 23.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | FI | 22.12.2021 | |
LT | 22.12.2021 | ||
RS | 22.12.2021 | ||
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | RS | 22.12.2021 | |
BG | 22.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 22.03.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2426865 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,5,7,8,11-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 251] , [ 259] * * figures 1, 30 * [A] 9,10 [I] 2,3,6; | [A]EP2481175 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15* figure 3 * | International search | [A]JPH11259247 (MONARCH MARKING SYSTEMS INC) [A] 1-15* , paragraph [0029] & US 6163538 A column 7, lines 29 to 45 & EP 918416 A2 & CA 2246638 A *; | [A]JP2012525759 (Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.) [A] 1-15 * , paragraphs [0054], [0235] to [0246] & US 2012/0119902 A1 paragraphs [0098], [0294] to [0306] * |