EP3306159 - PIPING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Metal Mining Co., Ltd. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAMOTO, Yoshiharu c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | 02 /
MUTA, Souichirou c/o SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO. LTD. 11-3, Shimbashi 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8716 / JP | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London, SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16803145.8 | 24.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016JP65335 | Priority number, date | JP20150112148 | 02.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015112148 | [2018/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016194710 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3306159 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16L58/14, F16L57/06, F16L9/14, // F16L23/024, C22B3/02, C22B23/00, C22B3/00 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
F16L57/06 (EP);
F16L58/14 (EP);
F16L9/14 (EP);
C22B23/043 (EP);
F16L23/024 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | F16L9/14, F16L23/024, F16L57/00, F16L58/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | ROHRLEITUNG | [2018/15] | English: | PIPING | [2018/15] | French: | TUYAUTERIE | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2017 | Translation filed | 22.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 22.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 30.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE9320465U (TH SCHOLTEN GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph l * * page 4, paragraph l - page 5, paragraph 1; figure . * [I] 2; | [XAI]US2009084457 (TSUCHIE YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0051]; figure - * [A] 5 [I] 2; | [XAI]US2014332105 (DUNN DONALD C [US]) [X] 1,4,6,7 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034]; figure - * [A] 3,5 [I] 2; | [XA]JPH06249393 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD) [X] 1,4,6,7 * abstract * [A] 2,3,5; | [XA]JPH0642693 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,4,6 * abstract * [A] 2,3,5,7; | [A]US2015014225 (MITSUI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0018]; figure - * | International search | [XY]JPS5877990 (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO) [X] 1, 3, 4 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 5-7; | [Y]JPH06249393 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD) [Y] 2-7 * , paragraphs [0005] to [0012]; fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JPH03124097U (Sumitomo Light Metal Industries, Ltd.) [Y] 2-7 * , page 8; fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2014057955 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [Y] 6, 7 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0013] & JP 2013-241668 A & US 2015/0086450 A1 paragraphs [0002] to [0013] & WO 2013/161599 A & EP 2843064 A1 & AU 2013253807 A & CA 2871604 A *; | [Y]JPH07119873 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 7 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0024]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP3136954U (Nowla Engineering Co., Ltd.) [Y] 7 * , claim 5; paragraph [0024] & US 2010/0059988 A1 paragraph [0066]; claim 13 & WO 2009/028322 A1 & KR 10-2010-0046104 A & TW 200923239 A *; | [A]JP2001050474 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-7 * , fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH0642693 (ONODA CEMENT CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) * |