EP3304477 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR QUALITY MANAGEMENT PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Greeneden U.S. Holdings II, LLC 2001 Junipero Serra Boulevard Daly City, CA 94014 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VYMENETS, Leonid c/o GENESYS TELECOMMUNICATIONS LABORATORIES INC. 2001 Junipero Serra Blvd. Daly City, California 94014 / US | 02 /
MACARTHUR, Cayley c/o GENESYS TELECOMMUNICATIONS LABORATORIES INC. 2001 Junipero Serra Blvd. Daly City, California 94014 / US | 03 /
KONIG, Yochai c/o GENESYS TELECOMMUNICATIONS LABORATORIES INC. 2001 Junipero Serra Blvd. Daly City, California 94014 / US | 04 /
LO, Wayne c/o GENESYS TELECOMMUNICATIONS LABORATORIES INC. 2001 Junipero Serra Blvd. Daly City, California 94014 / US | 05 /
KUMAR, Praphul c/o GENESYS TELECOMMUNICATIONS LABORATORIES INC. 2001 Junipero Serra Blvd. Daly City, California 94014 / US | 06 /
RISTOCK, Herbert Willi Artur c/o GENESYS TELECOMMUNICATIONS LABORATORIES INC. 2001 Junipero Serra Blvd. Daly City, California 94014 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16804083.0 | 26.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US34490 | Priority number, date | US201514726491 | 30.05.2015 Original published format: US201514726491 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016196234 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3304477 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q10/06, G06Q30/00 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
G06Q10/063118 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0281 (KR);
G06Q10/06311 (KR);
G06Q10/06393 (KR);
G06Q10/06395 (KR);
G06Q10/06398 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q30/016 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | G06Q30/02, G06Q10/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR QUALITÄTSMANAGEMENTPLATTFORM | [2018/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR QUALITY MANAGEMENT PLATFORM | [2018/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉS À UNE PLATEFORME DE GESTION DE QUALITÉ | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 21.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2015048787 (MAXIMUS INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * page 1, line 33 - page 4, line 6; figures 1-16 * * page 6, line 2 - page 8, line 26 *; | [I]US2008114608 (BASTIEN RENE [CA]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0113] - [0118]; figures 1-14 *; | [I]US2013282446 (DOBELL COLIN [CA]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0081]; figures 1-64 * | International search | [Y]US2014143157 (JEFFS CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * See abstract, paragraphs [0012]-[0013],[0025],[0027],[0039], claims 1,7,10,18 and figures 1-3. *; | [Y]US2008313090 (PORTMAN LEONID [IL], et al) [Y] 1-17 * See abstract, paragraphs [0035],[0046]-[0049], claims 1-11 and figures 1-2. *; | [Y]US2014334611 (BARNES ROBERT JOHN [GB], et al) [Y] 2-4, 14, 18-20 * See abstract, paragraph [0099] and claims 1,8-9. *; | [Y]US2013021478 (HOBROCK LANCE M [US], et al) [Y] 7, 17 * See abstract, paragraph [0007] and claims 1,11,14. *; | [Y]US2004215453 (ORBACH JULIAN J [AU]) [Y] 8 * See abstract, claims 1-6 and figure 2. * |