EP3303350 - BASE-CATALYZED SILYLATION OF TERMINAL OLEFINIC C-H BONDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states California Institute of Technology 1200 East California Boulevard M/C 6-32 Pasadena, CA 91125 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Wenbo 1122 Cordova Street Apt. 7 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 02 /
TOUTOV, Anton 385 S Catalina Avenue Apt. 232 Pasadena, CA 91106 / US | 03 /
BETZ, Kerry 1805 Deer Valley Road Boulder, CO 80305 / US | 04 /
FEDOROV, Alexey Richtiarkade 7 CH-8304 Wallisellen / CH | 05 /
STOLTZ, Brian M. 1954 E. California Boulevard San Marino, CA 91108 / US | 06 /
GRUBBS, Robert H. 1700 Spruce Street South Pasadena, CA 91030 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/47] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2018/15] | Murgitroyd, George Edward Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16804095.4 | 27.05.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US34533 | Priority number, date | US201562168120P | 29.05.2015 Original published format: US 201562168120 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016196250 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3303350 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3303350 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/08 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
C07F7/0829 (EP,CN,US);
C07F17/02 (CN);
C08F30/08 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | C07F7/08, C07F7/20, B01J23/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BASENKATALYSIERTE SILYLIERUNG TERMINALER OLEFINISCHER C-H-BINDUNGEN | [2018/15] | English: | BASE-CATALYZED SILYLATION OF TERMINAL OLEFINIC C-H BONDS | [2018/15] | French: | SILYLATION CATALYSÉE PAR UNE BASE DE LIAISONS TERMINALES OLÉFINIQUES C-H | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 28.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 17.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.04.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21184258.8 / EP3909959 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.10.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 23.10.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.11.2023 | CZ | 22.11.2023 | DK | 22.11.2023 | EE | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | IT | 22.11.2023 | LT | 22.11.2023 | LV | 22.11.2023 | NL | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SE | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | BG | 22.02.2024 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | PT | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
CZ | 22.11.2023 | ||
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
EE | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
DK | 22.11.2023 | ||
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
LV | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SE | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
LT | 22.11.2023 | ||
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
PT | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 22.11.2023 | |
NL | 22.11.2023 | ||
BG | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - SPRENGERS J W ET AL, "Selective hydrosilylation of styrene using an in situ formed platinum(1,3-dimesityl-dihydroimidazol-2-ylidene) catalyst", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMIS, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (20030815), vol. 679, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0022-328X(03)00514-X, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 149 - 152, XP004446453 [X] 1-5,9-13 * paragraph [03.2] * * tables 1 entries 1-8 * * compound III * * page 149, column 1, line 1 - line 3 * [I] 6,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(03)00514-X | [X] - JIAYUN LI ET AL, "Hydrosilylation catalysed by a rhodium complex in a supercritical CO2/ionic liquid system", NEW JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, GB, (20100101), vol. 34, no. 7, doi:10.1039/c0nj00012d, ISSN 1144-0546, page 1330, XP055527185 [X] 1-5,9-13 * tables 1 antries 4-9, 11, 13, 14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0nj00012d | [X] - MANFRED SCHLOSSER ET AL, "The Regioselectivity of 1,3-Disubstituted Allylmetal Species Towards Electrophiles: 1-(Trimethylsilyl)alk-2-enylpotassium Compounds", SYNTHESIS, STUTTGART, DE., (19980501), vol. 1998, no. 05, doi:10.1055/s-1998-2060, ISSN 0039-7881, pages 707 - 709, XP055527204 [X] 1,3-5,7,9,11-15 * page 708, column 1, paragraph last - column 2, paragraph 1 * * scheme giving product 1a *; page 707, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1998-2060 | [X] - ZACHARY D. MILLER ET AL, "Regioselective Allene Hydrosilylation Catalyzed by N -Heterocyclic Carbene Complexes of Nickel and Palladium", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (20131003), vol. 135, no. 41, doi:10.1021/ja407749w, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 15282 - 15285, XP055527187 [X] 1-3,9-11 * scheme 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja407749w | [X] - KEIJI TANINO ET AL, "Control of Stereochemistry by [sigma]-Participation of a Silyl Group. A Novel Method for Diastereoselective Polyol Synthesis", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (19970601), vol. 62, no. 13, doi:10.1021/jo9703515, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 4206 - 4207, XP055527195 [X] 1-3,9-11 * scheme 2 (method A) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo9703515 | [X] - SARAH V. MAIFELD ET AL, "Unusual Tandem Alkynylation and trans -Hydrosilylation To Form Oxasilacyclopentenes", ORGANIC LETTERS, US, (20051001), vol. 7, no. 22, doi:10.1021/ol051996r, ISSN 1523-7060, pages 4995 - 4998, XP055527192 [X] 1,2,9,10 * tables 3 entries 3, 5, 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ol051996r | [X] - K TAKAI ET AL, "RX.ID=4249653", CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (19950101), no. 4, pages 315 - 316, XP055530688 [X] 1,2,9,10 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2013096274 (VYAKARANAM KAMESWARA R [US], et al) [A] 1-40 * See the whole document. *; | [A]WO2014055587 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHONOLGY [US]) [A] 1-40 * See the whole document. *; | [A] - BIAO LU et al., "Iridium-Catalyzed (Z)-Trialkylsilylation of Terminal Olefins", J. Org. Chem., (20100208), vol. 75, no. 5, pages 1701 - 1705, XP055335237 [A] 1-40 * See the whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo902678p | [A] - JESSE R. MCATEE et al., "Preparation of Allyl and Vinyl Silanes by the Palladium-Catalyzed Silylation of Terminal Olefins: A Silyl-Heck Reaction", Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20120410), vol. 51, pages 3663 - 3667, XP055335238 [A] 1-40 * See the whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201200060 | [A] - ROMAN N. NAUMOV et al., "Selective Dehydrogenative Silylation?Hydrogenation Reaction of Divinyldisiloxane with Hydrosilane Catalyzed by an Iron Complex", J. Am. Chem.Soc., (20111229), vol. 134, no. 2, pages 804 - 807, XP055335239 [A] 1-40 * See the whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja209436s | by applicant | US9000167 | - SPRENGERS J. W. et al., "Selective hydrosilylation of styrene suing an in situ formed platinium (1,3-dimesityl-dihydroimidazol-2-ylidene) catalyst", Journal of Organometallic Chemistry, vol. 679, no. 2, pages 149 - 152 | - JIAYUN LI et al., "Hydrosilylation catalysed by a rhodium complex in a supercritical C02/ionic liquid system", New Journal of Chemistry, vol. 34, no. 7, doi:10.1039/c0nj00012d, page 1330, XP055527185 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c0nj00012d | - ZACHARY D. MILLER et al., "Regioselective Allene Hydrosilylation Catalysed by N-Heterocyclic Carbene Complexes of Nickel and Palladium", Journal of The American Chemistry Society, vol. 135, no. 41, doi:10.1021/ja407749w, pages 15282 - 15285, XP055527187 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja407749w | - KIM et al., J. Amer. Chem. Soc., (20040000), vol. 126, no. 33, pages 10242 - 10243 | - HILT., G. et al., Org. Lett., (20110000), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 304 - 307 | - K. MIURA et al., Tetrahedron Letters, (20000000), vol. 41, pages 2129 - 2132 | - TROST, B. et al., Org. Lett., (20030000), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 1895 - 1898 | - M. G. MCLAUGHLIN et al., Cook, Org. Lett., (20150000), vol. 17, pages 10 - 13 | - S. E. DENMARKS. A. TYMONKO, J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20050000), vol. 127, pages 8004 - 8005 | - KOUMAGIO et al., Tetrahedron Lett., (19840000), vol. 25, page 717 | - SUZUKI, K. et al., Org. Lett., (20040000), vol. 6, pages 409 - 411 | - DUDLEY, B. et al., Org. Lett., (20070000), vol. 9, pages 2839 - 2842 | - TROST, B.M., Chem. Int. Ed., (20030000), vol. 42, pages 3415 - 3418 | - OCHIAI, M. et al., Tetrahedron, (19880000), vol. 44, no. 13, pages 4095 - 4112 |