EP3304219 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SUPERIOR PERFORMANCE WITH RESPECT TO BEST PERFORMANCE VALUES IN MODEL PREDICTIVE CONTROL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMRIT, Rishi 27010 Acadia Pine Lane Katy, Texas 77494 / US | 02 /
CARRETTE, Pierre Christian Marie G9/61 Panaga Seria, KB3534 / BN | 03 /
WILLIAMSON, John Martin 18039 Somerset Knolls Houston, Texas 77494 / US | 04 /
CANNEY, William Matthew 4302 Westerdale Drive Fulshear, Texas 77441 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Shell Legal Services IP p/a Carel van Bylandtlaan 16 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 16804405.5 | 02.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US35454 | Priority number, date | US201562171598P | 05.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562171598 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016196752 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3304219 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3304219 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/00, G05B13/02, G05B13/04 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
G05B13/042 (EP,US);
G05B13/041 (US);
G05B13/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN LEISTUNG IN BEZUG AUF BESTLEISTUNGSWERTE IN MODELLPRÄDIKTIVEN STEUERUNGSANWENDUNGEN | [2018/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SUPERIOR PERFORMANCE WITH RESPECT TO BEST PERFORMANCE VALUES IN MODEL PREDICTIVE CONTROL APPLICATIONS | [2018/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR UNE PERFORMANCE SUPÉRIEURE PAR RAPPORT AUX MEILLEURES VALEURS DE PERFORMANCE DANS DES APPLICATIONS DE CONTRÔLE PRÉDICTIF DE MODÈLES | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 28.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 28.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005154477 (MARTIN GREGORY D [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011172976 (BUDIMAN BENNY S [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A] - JAMES B. RAWLINGS ET AL, "Fundamentals of economic model predictive control", 2012 IEEE 51ST IEEE CONFERENCE ON DECISION AND CONTROL (CDC), (20130829), doi:10.1109/CDC.2012.6425822, ISBN 978-1-4673-2064-1, pages 3851 - 3861, XP055531044 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CDC.2012.6425822 | International search | [Y]US2005154477 (MARTIN GREGORY D [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * , entire document especially Fig. 2, 4, 6; para [0109]-[0112], [0138], [0155]-[0175], [0187], [0210]-[0224] *; | [Y]US2011172976 (BUDIMAN BENNY S [US], et al) [Y] 1-20* , ), entire document especially para [0046]-[0052] * | Examination | US2004049295 | by applicant | US2004049295 | - J. RAWLINGSR. AMRIT, "Performance Using Model Predictive Control", Nonlinear Model Predictive Control,, (20090000), pages 119 - 138 |