EP3305019 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC COOKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HR
HU
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
RS
SE
SI
SK
SM
TR
Panasonic Holdings Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2023/29] |
Former [2022/23] | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Holdings Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | |||
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | ||
For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUATTA, Davide v. Aldo Moro Biandronno 21024 Loc. Cassinetta (VA) / IT | 02 /
BRINDANI, Franco v. Aldo Moro Biandronno 21024 Loc. Cassinetta (VA) / IT | 03 /
SCABURRI, Adriano v. Aldo Moro Biandronno 21024 Loc. Cassinetta (VA) / IT | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2023/29] |
Former [2018/15] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16804529.2 | 03.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US35727 | Priority number, date | US201562170416P | 03.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562170416 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016196939 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3305019 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3305019 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/68 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H05B6/686 (EP,US);
H05B6/687 (EP,US);
H05B6/70 (EP,US);
H05B2206/044 (EP,US);
Y02B40/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN KOCHEN | [2018/15] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC COOKING | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE CUISSON ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUE | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 21.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.07.2023 | CZ | 19.07.2023 | DK | 19.07.2023 | EE | 19.07.2023 | ES | 19.07.2023 | FI | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | LT | 19.07.2023 | LV | 19.07.2023 | NL | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SE | 19.07.2023 | SI | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | PT | 20.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
EE | 19.07.2023 | ||
ES | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
CZ | 19.07.2023 | ||
DK | 19.07.2023 | ||
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
LV | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
PT | 20.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 19.07.2023 | |
FI | 19.07.2023 | ||
LT | 19.07.2023 | ||
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
SE | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 19.07.2023 | |
NL | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 19.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP2205043 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] - [0069] * [A] 7,10,11 [Y] 2,12-14; | [A]US2011168695 (OKAJIMA TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,7,10-12 * abstract *; | [A]EP2475221 (PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,7,10-12 * abstract *; | [A]WO2012109634 (GOJI LTD, et al) [A] 1,7,10,11 * abstract *; | [A]EP2495846 (NIPPON DENGYO KOSAKU KK [JP]) [A] 7,10,11* abstract *; | [YA]EP2618634 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [Y] 2,12-14 * abstract * [A] 7,10,11 | International search | [A]GB2193619 (APV MAGNETRONICS)[A] 1-6, 12-14; | [Y]FR2766272 (MOULINEX SA [FR]) [Y] 5-6 * (abstract) *; | [Y]RU2253193 (SANKT-PETERBURGSKIJ GOSUDARSTVENNYJ UNIVERSITET) [Y] 3-4 * (claims, fig.3, 6, 7, 9 p.11) *; | [Y]US7111247 (CHOI KYUNG-HWAN [KR], et al) [Y] 2-6, 12-14 * , (abstract, fig.6) *; | [XY]US2010176121 (NOBUE TOMOTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * ???.1-5, [(0009) - (0179)]). * [Y] 2-6, 12-14 | by applicant | EP2205043 |