29.04.2022 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
26.01.2022 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.08.2021 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.06.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.11.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.04.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
05.04.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
10.08.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
10.08.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
04.08.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.07.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
31.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
22.03.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
22.03.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
16.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.01.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
05.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|