Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020249132 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615173000 | 03.06.2016 | US202016853583 | 20.04.2020 | US201562171289 | 05.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10627323 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2020 | B2 | US2016356678 | 08.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615173000 | 03.06.2016 | US201562171289 | 05.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018520370 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562171289 | 05.06.2015 | WO2016US35862 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108351278 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201562171289 | 05.06.2015 | WO2016US35862 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3308131 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2019 | A4 | EP3308131 | 18.04.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562171289 | 05.06.2015 | WO2016US35862 | 03.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016197022 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562171289 | 05.06.2015 |