EP3302092 - IMPROVED METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR RECOVERING PROTEIN POWDER AND NATURAL OMEGA-3 OIL FROM ANIMAL TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.05.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advance International, Inc. 174 Lawrence Drive Unit J Livermore, CA 94551 / US | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GHORBANI, Shahmard, Maziar 3000-f Danville Boulevard 215 Alamo, CA 94507 / US | 02 /
COLTUN, Kerry 40 Tanbark Lane Alamo, CA 94507 / US | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Campabadal i Monfà, Gemma Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati LLP Rue Montoyer 47 1000 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 16804601.9 | 03.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US35908 | Priority number, date | US201562171173P | 04.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562171173 P | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016197057 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3302092 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/04, A23J3/00, B02C18/00, C11B1/10 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
C07K1/36 (EP,US);
A23J1/04 (EP,KR,US);
A23J3/04 (KR);
B02C18/00 (KR);
C11B1/10 (EP,US);
C11B1/108 (EP,US);
C11B1/12 (EP,US);
C11B13/00 (EP,US);
C11B3/001 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | A23J1/04, A23J3/00, B02C18/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON PROTEINPULVER UND NATÜRLICHEM OMEGA-3-ÖL AUS TIERGEWEBE | [2018/15] | English: | IMPROVED METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR RECOVERING PROTEIN POWDER AND NATURAL OMEGA-3 OIL FROM ANIMAL TISSUE | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES AMÉLIORÉS DE RECUEIL D'UNE POUDRE DE PROTÉINES ET D'HUILE OMÉGA 3 À PARTIR D'UN TISSU ANIMAL | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 18.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 16.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.11.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.03.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 30.03.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.04.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 08.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   29.12.2023 | 30.06.2024 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3076708 (CHARLES CAVANAGH JOHN) [X] 1-15 * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 8; figure .; example - * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 42 * * column 4, line 35 - line 37 * * column 6, line 36 - column 8, line 20 * [Y] 1-15; | [X]GB1156500 (GULF COAST INST OF RES AND TEC [US]) [X] 14,15 * claims 1, 16-19 *; | [X]CA891977 (PENNWALT CORP) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]US3649294 (THIJSSEN HENRICUS A C) [X] 1-15 * example -; claim - *; | [X]FR2340055 (OS BAD ROZWOJOWY BIALK [PL]) [X] 1-15 * examples 2,3 *; | [X]US2010189874 (ORTEGA ROBERTO FLORES [MX]) [X] 14,15 * example -; claim -; table 2 *; | [X]WO2011051743 (THAROS LTD [CL]) [X] 1,10,14,15 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]US2014024064 (BURLEW KEITH H [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* claims 1, 13, 24, 26 * | International search | [A]EP0301795 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-3, 17-19 * See claims 1-2, 4, 9. *; | [A]US5053234 (ANDERSON PAUL S [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 17-19* See claims 1, 26-27, 32 and figures 1-2. *; | [A]US7763717 (JACZYNSKI JACEK [US]) [A] 1-3, 17-19 * See claims 1, 14, 27 and figures 1-5. *; | [A]US8663725 (ORTEGA ROBERTO FLORES [MX]) [A] 1-3, 17-19 * See claims 1, 5, 9, 13, 17 and figures 1-4. *; | [X]US2014272045 (GHORBANI SHAHMARD MAZIAR [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 17-19 * See paragraphs [0037], [0049]-[0051], [0058]-[0060], [0066]; claims 1-2, 13, 21, 23 and figure 3. * |