EP3542351 - MONITORING DEVICE FOR MONITORING A MONITORING REGION, AND MONITORING SYSTEM HAVING SAID MONITORING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.08.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2019/39] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NADENAU, Marcus Biberweg 27A 85598 Baldham / DE | 02 /
STANGL, Tobias Albert-Schalper-Str. 5c 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | [2019/39] | Application number, filing date | 16805023.5 | 21.11.2016 | [2019/39] | WO2016EP78227 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018091108 | Date: | 24.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3542351 | Date: | 25.09.2019 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.05.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2019/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.05.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/00 | [2019/39] | CPC: |
G08B13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/39] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES ÜBERWACHUNGSBEREICHES UND ÜBERWACHUNGSANLAGE MIT DER ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2019/39] | English: | MONITORING DEVICE FOR MONITORING A MONITORING REGION, AND MONITORING SYSTEM HAVING SAID MONITORING DEVICE | [2019/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE POUR SURVEILLER UNE ZONE DE SURVEILLANCE ET SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE ÉQUIPÉ DU DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE | [2019/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2019 | Examination requested [2019/39] | 21.06.2019 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2021 | 23.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/02] | 02.09.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/02] | 03.11.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2005258943 (MIAN ZAHID F [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0084] * * figures 1-9 * [Y] 4,5; | [X]EP2046040 (KD SECURE LLC [US]) [X] 1-3,6-14 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0088] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0127] * * paragraph [0137] * * paragraph [0152] * * paragraph [0182] * * paragraph [0186] * * paragraph [0198] - paragraph [0205] * * figures 1,2,5,11,12 *; | [Y]US2013038737 (YEHEZKEL RAANAN YONATAN [IL], et al) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0041] *; | [A]US2008201277 (OZDEMIR HASAN TIMUCIN [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016165187 (RASHEED ZEESHAN [US], et al) [A] 4,5 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102005006989 |