EP3397435 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LAYING VENEER PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hanses Sägewerkstechnik GmbH & Co. KG Zum Osterfeld 2 59872 Meschede-Remblinghausen / DE | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSES, Josef Auf der Knippe 20 59872 Meschede-Remblinghausen / DE | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Artur-Ladebeck-Strasse 51 33617 Bielefeld / DE | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 16805790.9 | 01.12.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016EP79502 | Priority number, date | DE201510122943 | 30.12.2015 Original published format: DE102015122943 | [2018/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017114632 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397435 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B27D1/00, B23Q7/04, B27D1/04, B27D3/04 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
B27D1/00 (EP);
B27D1/04 (EP);
B27D3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM LEGEN VON FURNIERTAFELN | [2018/45] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LAYING VENEER PANELS | [2018/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PLACEMENT DE FEUILLES DE PLACAGE | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 05.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2004143960 (UTECHT MARTIN J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * figure - * * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0032] * [I] 3,7-11; | [XI]DE102009021368 (DIEFFENBACHER MASCHINENFABRIK [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034] * * figures 10, 12 * [I] 3; | [XP]DE102015100033 (POLLMEIER RALF [DE]) [XP] 1,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] * * figure - *; | [A]DE1481361 (MUELLER KG C) [A] 1,6-9 * page 8, line 16 - page 9, line 25 * * figure 1 * |