EP3370786 - HEMOSTATIC MIXTURE OF CELLULOSE-BASED SHORT AND LONG FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.11.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omrix Biopharmaceuticals Ltd. Bldg.14 Weizmann Science Park P.O. Box 619 Rehovot 7610601 / IL | For all designated states Ethicon, Inc. P.O. Box 151 U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ILAN, Erez Kibbutz 7039500 Netzer Sereni / IL | 02 /
FAINGOLD, Omri 11 Hashaked Street 7408720 Ness Ziona / IL | 03 /
FREIZUS, Nataly 4/4 Leshem Street 8906329 Arad / IL | 04 /
EAVRI, Ronen 11 Hashibolet Street 3055809 Binyamina / IL | 05 /
LOONEY, Dwayne 31 North Main Street Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | 06 /
DHANARAJ, Sridevi C/O Ethicon Biosurgery Route 22 West T702A Somerville, NJ / US | 07 /
GALLOWAY, James U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | 08 /
DANKER, Walter 2013 Beacon Hill Drive Newton, PA / US | [2018/39] |
Former [2018/37] | 01 /
ILAN, Erez Kibbutz 7039500 Netzer Sereni / IL | ||
02 /
FAINGOLD, Omri 11 Hashaked Street 7408720 Ness Ziona / IL | |||
03 /
FREIZUS, Nataly 4/4 Leshem Street 8906329 Arad / IL | |||
04 /
EAVRI, Ronen 11 Hashibolet Street 3055809 Binyamina / IL | |||
05 /
LOONEY, Dwayne 31 North Main Street Flemington, NJ 08822 / US | |||
06 /
DHANARAJ, Sridevi 3 Roderer Drive Raritan, NJ 08869 / US | |||
07 /
GALLOWAY, James U.S. Route 22 Somerville, NJ 08876 / US | |||
08 /
DANKER, Walter 2013 Beacon Hill Drive Newton, PA / US | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Kirsch, Susan Edith Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16805906.1 | 08.11.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016IL00020 | Priority number, date | IL20150242496 | 08.11.2015 Original published format: IL 24249615 | IL20150242497 | 08.11.2015 Original published format: IL 24249715 | US201562252785P | 09.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252785 P | US201562252796P | 09.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562252796 P | [2018/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017077526 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3370786 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3370786 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/08, A61L24/00, A61L24/04, A61P7/04, A61P17/02 | [2020/22] | CPC: |
A61L24/001 (EP,IL,US);
A61L24/06 (IL,KR,US);
A61L24/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61L26/0023 (KR,US);
A61L24/0015 (KR,US);
A61L24/02 (KR,US);
A61L24/043 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61L26/00 (US);
A61L26/0004 (KR,US);
A61L26/0066 (KR);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
C08L1/04 (IL);
A61L2300/106 (US);
A61L2300/232 (KR,US);
A61L2300/25 (US);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/043, C08L1/04 (EP,US);
A61L24/06, C08L1/04 (US);
A61L24/08, C08L1/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2018/37] | A61L24/06, A61L24/04, A61L24/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HÄMOSTATISCHE MISCHUNG AUS CELLULOSEBASIERTEN KURZEN UND LANGEN FASERN | [2018/37] | English: | HEMOSTATIC MIXTURE OF CELLULOSE-BASED SHORT AND LONG FIBERS | [2018/37] | French: | MÉLANGE HÉMOSTATIQUE DE FIBRES COURTES ET LONGUES À BASE DE CELLULOSE | [2018/37] | Entry into regional phase | 08.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 08.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21169067.2 / EP3868414 | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.11.2016 | AL | 28.07.2021 | AT | 28.07.2021 | CY | 28.07.2021 | CZ | 28.07.2021 | DK | 28.07.2021 | EE | 28.07.2021 | FI | 28.07.2021 | HR | 28.07.2021 | LT | 28.07.2021 | LV | 28.07.2021 | MC | 28.07.2021 | MK | 28.07.2021 | MT | 28.07.2021 | NL | 28.07.2021 | PL | 28.07.2021 | RO | 28.07.2021 | RS | 28.07.2021 | SE | 28.07.2021 | SI | 28.07.2021 | SK | 28.07.2021 | SM | 28.07.2021 | BG | 28.10.2021 | NO | 28.10.2021 | GR | 29.10.2021 | IE | 08.11.2021 | LU | 08.11.2021 | IS | 28.11.2021 | PT | 29.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
MK | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CY | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 08.11.2016 | |
AL | 28.07.2021 | ||
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IE | 08.11.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
LU | 08.11.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
MC | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.07.2021 | |
AT | 28.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SI | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
SM | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
CZ | 28.07.2021 | ||
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
EE | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RO | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
SK | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
DK | 28.07.2021 | ||
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
HR | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
LV | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
PL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
GR | 29.10.2021 | ||
IS | 28.11.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
RS | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
PT | 29.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
FI | 28.07.2021 | ||
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
SE | 28.07.2021 | ||
BG | 28.10.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.07.2021 | |
LT | 28.07.2021 | ||
NL | 28.07.2021 | ||
NO | 28.10.2021 | Cited in | International search | [A]RU2522879 ; | [A]US4637815 (LEMOLE GERALD M [US]); | [XI]EP0216378 (STATNI VYZKUMNY USTAV TEXTILNI [CS]); | [A]WO9640033 (CLARION PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [A]US2013316974 (WANG YI-LAN [US], et al); | by applicant | US1540979 | US3364200 | US4626253 | US5180398 | US5696191 | WO0124841 | US6225461 | US6309454 | EP1323436 | US6627749 | US2004005350 | US2006233869 | WO2007076415 | US2008027365 | US8815832 |