|
05.08.2020 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2019 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2019 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2019 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2019 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
26.04.2019 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
02.04.2019 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
15.06.2018 |
Confirmation of effective date of early entry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
64 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
02.05.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
11 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Incoming letter related to ISA procedure |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Reply to invitation to pay additional fees |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
08.03.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Partial International Search Report |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
20.12.2016 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
46 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
13 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Fee calculation sheet for an international application |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
7 |