08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
23.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
09.07.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] |
28.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2021 [2021/26] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
09.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2020 [2020/46] |
21.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2020 [2020/39] |
14.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.09.2020 [2020/38] |
07.08.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
07.08.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 09.09.2020 [2020/37] |
31.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
31.07.2020 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] |
24.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2020 [2020/35] |
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
08.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2020 [2020/24] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
24.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2020 [2020/22] |
17.04.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2020 [2020/21] |
30.08.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
27.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
27.08.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.08.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
25.04.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.02.2019 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
08.02.2019 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
14.12.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.08.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
03.08.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
03.08.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
30.07.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
30.07.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.02.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|