Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108781232 | Global Dossier | 09.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201514958865 | 03.12.2015 | WO2016US62639 | 18.11.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3369240 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2019 | B1 | EP3369240 | 05.09.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514958865 | 03.12.2015 | WO2016US62639 | 18.11.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017095649 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514958865 | 03.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10362069 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2019 | B2 | US2017163693 | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514958865 | 03.12.2015 |