EP3377117 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IMAGING ANDROGEN RECEPTOR AXIS ACTIVITY IN CARCINOMA, AND RELATED THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, NY 10065 / US | [2018/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ULMERT, David c/o Memorial Sloan Kettering Cancer Center 1275 York Avenue New York, New York 10065 / US | [2018/39] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Holland, David Christopher Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16806415.2 | 18.11.2016 | [2018/39] | WO2016US62818 | Priority number, date | US201562257179P | 18.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562257179 P | [2018/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017087826 | Date: | 26.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3377117 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K49/00, A61K51/10, A61K31/568, A61K31/57, C07K16/30, A61P35/00, A61K103/40, A61K103/00 | [2018/39] | CPC: |
A61K51/1051 (EP,US);
A61K31/568 (EP,US);
A61K31/57 (EP,US);
A61K49/0032 (EP,US);
A61K49/0058 (EP,US);
A61K51/1072 (EP,US);
A61K51/1093 (EP,US);
A61K51/1096 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/3015 (EP,US);
C07K16/3069 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,US);
C07K2317/526 (EP,US);
C07K2317/71 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/568, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/57, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/39] | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ABBILDUNG DER ANDROGENREZEPTORACHSENAKTIVITÄT IM KARZINOM UND ENTSPRECHENDE THERAPEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2018/39] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IMAGING ANDROGEN RECEPTOR AXIS ACTIVITY IN CARCINOMA, AND RELATED THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS | [2018/39] | French: | SYSTÈMES, MÉTHODES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR L'IMAGERIE DE L'ACTIVITÉ DE L'AXE DU RÉCEPTEURS DES ANDROGÈNES DANS UN CARCINOME, ET COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES THÉRAPEUTIQUES ASSOCIÉES | [2018/39] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/39] | 15.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013063312 (SLOAN KETTERING INST CANCER [US]) [X] 1,3-6,8,10-16,18,19,22,24-26,28,30,32,41,43,48,50 * examples 1-6 * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0105] *; | [XA]WO2015075445 (FREDAX AB [SE], et al) [X] 41,43,48,50 * examples 1-9 * * page 18, line 7 - line 20 * * page 31, line 8 - line 11 * [A] 1-40,42,44-47,49,51,52; | [E]WO2016191186 (MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER [US]) [E] 35-52 * paragraph [0136] - paragraph [0144] *; | [A] - LE BEAU A M ET AL, "Targeting uPAR with antagonistic recombinant human antibodies in aggressive breast cancer", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, vol. 73, no. 7, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-12-3526, ISSN 0008-5472, (20130401), pages 2070 - 2081, (20130211), XP009170198 [A] 1-52 * abstract * * page 8, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 10, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-12-3526 | by applicant | US8663600 |