EP3309951 - LOAD DRIVING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2020 [2020/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Automotive Systems, Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU Ming c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 02 /
YAMAWAKI Taizo c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | 03 /
MAYUZUMI Takuya c/o Hitachi Automotive Systems Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 04 /
ISHIDA Ryosuke c/o Hitachi Automotive Systems Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 05 /
SUGIYAMA Yasushi c/o Hitachi Automotive Systems Ltd. 2520 Takaba Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8503 / JP | 06 /
ONO Goichi c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2018/16] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 16807198.3 | 12.04.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016JP61777 | Priority number, date | JP20150116206 | 09.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015116206 | [2018/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016199491 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3309951 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H02P3/22, H02P27/06, H02P29/024 | [2019/08] | CPC: |
H02P27/06 (EP,US);
H02P29/027 (EP,US);
H02P3/22 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/16] | H02P7/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Title | German: | LASTANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/16] | English: | LOAD DRIVING DEVICE | [2018/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PILOTAGE DE CHARGE | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2017 | Translation filed | 24.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 17.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/06] | 23.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2009045762 (HAYASHI HIROAKI [JP], et al) [I] 6,7 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0102]; figures 1,3 * [Y] 1-5; | [Y]EP2106016 (HITACHI IND EQUIPMENT SYS [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0029]; figure 3 *; | [Y]JPH0969435 (DENSO CORP) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0017] , [0031]; figure 7 *; | [Y]EP2394837 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0158] - paragraph [0159]; figures 11,19 * | International search | [A]JP2009136077 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO, et al) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2009/0200973 A1 paragraphs [0006] to [0011] & CN 101447665 A *; | [A]JP2014023373 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2015/0222206 A1 paragraphs [0056] to [0106] & WO 2014/017487 A1 *; | [A]JP2012144069 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2006517380 (Black & Decker Inc.) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings & US 2003/0042859 A1 paragraphs [0025] to [0076] & WO 2004/073140 A2 & EP 2264885 A1 *; | [A]JPH0969435 (DENSO CORP) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]CN103001549 (UNIV HOHAI) [A] 1-7 * , entire text; all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]US2013038260 (CHANG HAO-YU [TW], et al) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0029] to [0034] & CN 102931894 A paragraphs [0037] to [0043] * |