EP3298728 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SERVICE ORIENTED INPUT AND OUTPUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 30.03.2022 [2022/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIM, Yun-Jae c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Ji-Eun c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 03 /
MIN, Hyun-Suk c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 04 /
YOON, Ju-Seok c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Dong-Un c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Sang-Sun c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 07 /
LEE, Dong-Woo c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 08 /
CHOI, Byeong-Bae c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 09 /
RYU, Jong-Youb c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 10 /
LIM, Yong-Hyun c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 11 /
KANG, Jae-Eun c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | 12 /
KIM, Chang-Han c/o SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR | [2018/13] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [2018/13] | Application number, filing date | 16807851.7 | 10.06.2016 | [2018/13] | WO2016KR06195 | Priority number, date | KR20150083504 | 12.06.2015 Original published format: KR 20150083504 | KR20150174829 | 09.12.2015 Original published format: KR 20150174829 | [2018/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016200211 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3298728 | Date: | 28.03.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/28, H04L12/12, H04L29/08, G06F3/0346, H04N5/44, H04N5/445, H04N21/41, H04N21/422, H04N21/478 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
H04N21/478 (EP,US);
G06F3/017 (EP);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06F3/03547 (EP);
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G08C17/02 (EP);
H04N21/41265 (EP);
H04N21/4131 (EP);
H04N21/42204 (EP,US);
H04N21/4221 (EP,US);
H04N21/42228 (EP);
H04W4/80 (EP);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/167 (EP);
G08C2201/51 (EP);
G08C2201/91 (EP);
G08C2201/92 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/13] | H04L12/28, H04L12/12, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUR VORRICHTUNG ZUR DIENSTORIENTIERTEN EINGABE UND AUSGABE | [2018/13] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SERVICE ORIENTED INPUT AND OUTPUT | [2018/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ENTRÉES/SORTIES ORIENTÉES SERVICE | [2018/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/13] | 20.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.05.2022 | 15.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/13] | 25.11.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/13] | 12.05.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2007252721 (GEURTS LUCAS J F [NL]) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [I]US2012297019 (TING TUNG-SHENG [TW]) [I] 1-8* paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0061]; figure 3 * | International search | [YA]US2003071855 (KIM JEONG HYUN [KR]) [Y] 1-8 * See claims 1-10; and figures 3-4. * [A] 9-15; | [Y]KR100652928B (YUN JAE WOONG [KR]) [Y] 1-8, 10, 12-14 * See paragraphs [0011], [0075]; and figure 9. *; | [Y]US2005102699 (KIM JAE-KWON [KR], et al) [Y] 6, 7, 9-15 * See paragraph [0055]; claims 1-8; and figure 3A. *; | [Y]US2014337891 (JUNG DAE YOUNG [KR]) [Y] 9-13, 15 * See paragraphs [0082]-[0083]; and claims 1-10. *; | [A]US2013278838 (CHOI SUN YOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0030]-[0071]; claims 1-12; and figures 1-9. * |