EP3303920 - MULTI-AIR CHAMBER BURNER WITH SWIRL GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Latin America Exports, Inc. Tecnicolados Del Bajio Sa De CV Vasco De Quiroga 700-C Col. Morelos CP 36584 Las Vegas, NV 89101 / US | For:ES
IT
NL
Hernandez Cruz, Pedro Vasco De Quiroga 700-C Col. Morelos Irapuato, Gto., C.P. 36584 / MX | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRUZ, Pedro, Hernandez Tecnicolados Del Bajio Sa De CV Vasco De Quiroga 700-C Col. Morelos CP 36584 Irapuato Gto. CP 36584 / MX | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Gottfried, Hans-Peter Patentanwalt Messering 8f 01067 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/15] | Gottfried, Hans-Peter Hamburger Straße 10 01067 Dresden / DE | Application number, filing date | 16808236.0 | 08.06.2016 | [2018/15] | WO2016US36536 | Priority number, date | US201514733293 | 08.06.2015 Original published format: US201514733293 | [2018/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016201012 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3303920 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/02 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
F23D14/02 (EP,US);
F23C6/045 (EP,US);
F23C7/00 (EP,US);
F23D14/58 (US);
F23D14/62 (US);
F23D14/70 (US);
F23C2201/20 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | F23C7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | MEHRLUFTKAMMERBRENNER MIT DRALLERZEUGER | [2018/15] | English: | MULTI-AIR CHAMBER BURNER WITH SWIRL GENERATOR | [2018/15] | French: | BRÛLEUR À CHAMBRES À AIR MULTIPLES AVEC GÉNÉRATEUR DE TOURBILLON | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 08.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 08.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/51] | 23.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPH07127817 (TAKUMA KK) [X] 19 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] * * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] * * paragraph [0026] * [A] 1-17 [I] 18,20; | [A]GB993612 (KUEPPERSBUSCH) [A] 1,18 * page 1, line 10 - line 17; figure 1 * * page 1, line 86 - page 2, line 64 *; | [A]DE102013019934 (BRINKMANN IND FEUERUNGSSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0020] - [0022]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]US4708637 (DUTESCU CORNEL J [US]) [A] 1-20 * . Fig. 1; col 3, ln 13-15; col 3, ln 68-col 4, ln 3; col 4, ln 11-12, 29-30. *; | [A]US2497321 (PATTINSON JOHN R, et al) [A] 1-20 * . Fig. 1; col 1, ln 31-33; col 2, ln 39-47. *; | [A]US4559009 (MARINO JOHN A [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * . Figs. 1, 9; col 3, ln 15-17; col 5, ln 29-31. *; | [A]US7163392 (FEESE JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * . Fig. 1; Abstract; col 8, ln 47-49. *; | [A]US4938019 (ANGELL FENTON L [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * . Fig. 3; col 4, ln 54-56. * |