EP3308252 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FINGER POSITION TRACKING AND HAPTIC DISPLAY USING CONDUCTIVE ISLANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northwestern University 633 Clark Street Evanston, IL 60208 / US | [2018/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLGATE, James E. 2210 Asbury Avenue Evanston, IL 60201 / US | 02 /
PESHKIN, Michael A. 927 Ashbury Evanston, IL 60202 / US | [2023/40] |
Former [2018/16] | 01 /
COLGATE, James E. 2210 Asbury Avenue Evanston, Illinois 60201 / US | ||
02 /
PESHKIN, Michael A. 927 Ashbury Evanston, Illinois 60202 / US | Representative(s) | Bartle Read Liverpool Science Park 131 Mount Pleasant Liverpool L3 5TF / GB | [2018/16] | Application number, filing date | 16808362.4 | 10.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016US36866 | Priority number, date | US201562173732P | 10.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562173732 P | US201615178283 | 09.06.2016 Original published format: US201615178283 | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016201210 | Date: | 15.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3308252 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3308252 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/044, G06F3/01 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/0416 (US);
G06F3/04164 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/044 (US);
G09B21/003 (EP,KR,US);
G06F2203/04111 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR FINGERPOSITIONSVERFOLGUNG UND HAPTISCHE ANZEIGE MIT LEITFÄHIGEN INSELN | [2018/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FINGER POSITION TRACKING AND HAPTIC DISPLAY USING CONDUCTIVE ISLANDS | [2018/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR LE SUIVI DE LA POSITION DE DOIGTS, ET AFFICHAGE HAPTIQUE UTILISANT DES ÎLOTS CONDUCTEURS | [2018/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 04.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.10.2023 | CZ | 04.10.2023 | DK | 04.10.2023 | EE | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | IT | 04.10.2023 | LT | 04.10.2023 | LV | 04.10.2023 | NL | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SE | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | BG | 04.01.2024 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | PT | 05.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
CZ | 04.10.2023 | ||
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
EE | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
DK | 04.10.2023 | ||
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
LV | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SE | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
LT | 04.10.2023 | ||
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
PT | 05.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 04.10.2023 | |
NL | 04.10.2023 | ||
BG | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 04.10.2023 | |
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 04.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2013307789 (KARAMATH JAMES ROBERT [MX], et al) [Y] 8,9,18,19 * paragraphs [0024] , [0121] , [0140] - [0144] - [0171] *[A] 1-7,10-17,20; | [XY]US2014062934 (COULSON MICHAEL PAUL [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,10-17,20 * paragraphs [0099] , [0102] , [0104] , [0105] , [0126] * [Y] 8,9,18,19 | International search | [A]US2012038583 (WESTHUES JONATHAN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0038]; and figure 4. *; | [A]KR20130014317 (TPK TOUCH SOLUTIONS XIAMEN INC [CN]) [A] 1-20 * See paragraphs [0011]-[0012]; and figure 2. *; | [A]KR20140023428 (APPLE INC [US]) [A] 1-20* See paragraphs [0018]-[0020]; and figures 5a-5d. *; | [A]US2014211110 (LI HAO [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * See paragraph [0045]; and figures 2-3. *; | [XA]US2015042600 (LUKANC JEFFREY [US], et al) [X] 1-7, 11-17 * See paragraphs [0034], [0036], [0066], [0072], [0075]; claim 1; and figures 2, 4, 8. * [A] 8-10, 18-20 |