EP3380827 - HOLLOW POLYMER FIBER OPTIC SYSTEM FOR SINGLE ANALYTE AND MULTIPLEXED ANALYTE DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Revvity Health Sciences, Inc. 940 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2023/40] |
Former [2018/40] | For all designated states PerkinElmer Health Sciences, Inc. 940 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSSE, Roger 2161 des Tulipes Longueuil, Québec J4N 1P6 / CA | 02 /
YARED, Wael I. 22 Hastings Road Lexington, Massachusetts 02421 / US | 03 /
HARVEY, Peter A. 122 Church Street Wilmington, Massachusetts 01887 / US | 04 /
GROVES, Kevin 37 Henderson St. Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | 05 /
FAQIR, Ilias 36 Greenview Drive Holliston, Massachusetts 01746 / US | 06 /
MELTZER, Michael 423A Neponset Street Norwood, Massachusetts 02062 / US | [2023/48] |
Former [2018/40] | 01 /
BOSSE, Roger 2161 des Tulipes Longueuil Québec J4N 1P6 / CA | ||
02 /
YARED, Wael I. 22 Hastings Road Lexington Massachusetts 02421 / US | |||
03 /
HARVEY, Peter A. 122 Church Street Wilmington Massachusetts 01887 / US | |||
04 /
GROVES, Kevin 37 Henderson St. Arlington Massachusetts 02474 / US | |||
05 /
FAQIR, Ilias 36 Greenview Drive Holliston Massachusetts 01746 / US | |||
06 /
MELTZER, Michael 423A Neponset Street Norwood Massachusetts 02062 / US | Representative(s) | Graham Watt & Co LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks TN13 3AJ / GB | [2023/48] |
Former [2018/40] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16810190.5 | 22.11.2016 | [2018/40] | WO2016US63400 | Priority number, date | US201562259000P | 23.11.2015 Original published format: US 201562259000 P | [2018/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017091609 | Date: | 01.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3380827 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3380827 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01N21/77, G01N33/543 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
G01N21/64 (EP,US);
G01N33/54373 (EP,US);
G01N21/77 (US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6441 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7709 (EP,US);
G01N2021/773 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7786 (US);
G01N2201/0221 (EP,US);
G01N33/552 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/40] | G01N21/64, G01N21/77, G01N33/53, G01N33/58 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT HOHLEN OPTISCHEN POLYMERFASERN ZUM NACHWEIS EINES EINZELNEN ANALYTS ODER ZUM MULTIPLEX-NACHWEIS VON ANALYTEN | [2023/05] | English: | HOLLOW POLYMER FIBER OPTIC SYSTEM FOR SINGLE ANALYTE AND MULTIPLEXED ANALYTE DETECTION | [2018/40] | French: | SYSTÈME À FIBRES OPTIQUES CREUSES EN POLYMÈRE POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UN ANALYTE UNIQUE OU LA DÉTECTION MULTIPLEXE D'ANALYTES | [2023/05] |
Former [2018/40] | HOHLPOLYMERFASEROPTIK FÜR EINZELANALYT- UND MULTIPLEX-ANALYT-NACHWEIS | ||
Former [2018/40] | SYSTÈME À FIBRE OPTIQUE POLYMÈRE CREUSE POUR LA DÉTECTION D'UN ANALYTE UNIQUE ET D'ANALYTES MULTIPLES | Entry into regional phase | 01.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/40] | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 02.04.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 20.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Request for further processing for: | 02.04.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.04.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.11.2023 | CZ | 29.11.2023 | DK | 29.11.2023 | EE | 29.11.2023 | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | IT | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RO | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | SK | 29.11.2023 | SM | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | PT | 01.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 29.11.2023 | |
CZ | 29.11.2023 | ||
DK | 29.11.2023 | ||
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RO | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
EE | 29.11.2023 | ||
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 29.11.2023 | |
ES | 29.11.2023 | ||
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
SM | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
LV | 29.11.2023 | ||
NL | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0173129 (DADE BEHRING INC [US]) [Y] 3-8,10,11,71-87,91,92 * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 7 * * page 5, lines 11-26 * * page 6, lines 5-14 ** page 12, lines 1-18 *; | [XI]US2009156942 (PHILLIPS ERICA M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,23-27,31,32,34,50 * paragraphs [0025] , [0 30] , [0 62] , [0 71] - [0078] * * figures 1, 4A-4D, 5 * [I] 28-30,33,35-43,51-57; | [XYI]US2009227043 (HUANG WEI [US]) [X] 1,2,9,23,31,32,34 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 49] , [0 50] , [0 53] , [0 61] , [0 92] , [0 98] - [0100] - [ 108] - [0110] * * figures 8, 13, 14 * [Y] 3-8,10,11,71-87,91,92 [I] 12-22,29,33,35,44-49,88-90 |