EP3390298 - PRODUCTION AND AFTERTREATMENT OF A SILICA GLASS ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Quarzglas GmbH & Co. KG Quarzstasse 8 63450 Hanau / DE | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OTTER, Matthias Leni-Schulze-Everding-Platz 2 59075 Hamm / DE | 02 /
LEHMANN, Walter Magdeburger Str. 25 04155 Leipzig / DE | 03 /
HÜNERMANN, Michael Drosselweg 19 63755 Alzenau / DE | 04 /
NIELSEN, Nils Christian Habsburger Ring 14 67307 Göllheim / DE | 05 /
WHIPPEY, Nigel Robert Trieler Ring 66 63500 Seligenstadt / DE | 06 /
GROMANN, Boris Spessartstraße 22 63743 Aschaffenburg / DE | 07 /
KPEBANE, Abdoul-Gafar Raiffeisenstraße 1 63454 Hanau-Mittelbuchen / DE | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Herzog IP Patentanwalts GmbH Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/43] | Herzog, Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Immermannstrasse 40 40210 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16810409.9 | 16.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016EP81464 | Priority number, date | EP20150201139 | 18.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15201139 | [2018/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017103133 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3390298 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C03B20/00, C03B37/012, C03C15/00, C03C3/06, C03B19/10, C03B19/06, C03B17/04 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
C03B19/066 (EP,KR,US);
C03B20/00 (KR);
C03B17/04 (EP,KR,US);
C03B19/106 (EP,KR,US);
C03B37/01228 (EP,KR,US);
C03B37/01231 (EP,KR,US);
C03C13/045 (US);
C03C23/0075 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/06 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Title | German: | HERSTELLEN UND NACHBEHANDELN EINES QUARZGLASKÖRPERS | [2018/43] | English: | PRODUCTION AND AFTERTREATMENT OF A SILICA GLASS ARTICLE | [2018/43] | French: | FABRICATION ET POST-TRAITEMENT D'UN CORPS EN VERRE DE SILICE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 13.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/34] | 21.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US4358306 (OKAMOTO HARUO, et al) [X] 13,14 * examples 1,2 * [A] 1-5,12 [I] 17; | [X]US4650511 (KOYA KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 13-15,17 * column 5, lines 1-2; examples 1,4 *; | [X]EP0385753 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 13,14* page 4, line 45 - page 5, line 8; claims 1,2,9,10 *; | [XAI]EP0598349 (SHINETSU QUARTZ PROD [JP], et al) [X] 13-15 * example - * [A] 1-5,12 [I] 17; | [XI]EP0711736 (TOSOH CORP [JP], et al) [X] 13,14 * page 5, lines 57-58; examples 1-4; table 1 * [I] 17; | [X]US6136736 (RAJARAM MOHAN [US], et al) [X] 13,14,16 * column 6, lines 21-47; examples 1-2; table 1 *; | [XI]US2004118155 (BROWN JOHN T [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * paragraph [0033]; claim 3 * [I] 17; | [XI]WO2005054139 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,5-8,10,11,13,14 * examples 1,2 * [I] 2-4,9,12,17; | [XI]DE102004038602 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE]) [X] 1,6-8,10,11,13,14 * paragraphs [0063] , [0065] , [0070] , [0071]; table 1 * [I] 2-5,9,12; | [X]US2006055300 (JANOS ALAN [US], et al) [X] 13,14,16 * paragraphs [0020] - [0029] - [0034] , [0035] , [0037]; table 1 *; | [X]US2006183623 (IKUTA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 13,14,17 * paragraphs [0029] , [0044]; example -; claims 1,5; table 2 *; | [X]EP2070883 (TOSOH CORP [JP], et al) [X] 13,14,17 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047]; examples 1,2; claims 1,3; tables 1-3 *; | [X]US2009208760 (KUWAHARA MADOKA [JP], et al) [X] 13-15 * paragraphs [0059] , [0089] , [0117] , [0118]; examples 1-3; claim 3 *; | [XI]DE102008033945 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE]) [X] 1,6,7,10,13,14 * paragraphs [0082] , [0083]; examples 1,4 * [I] 2-5,8,9,11,12,17; | [XI]WO2013149882 (HERAEUS QUARZGLAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,6-8,10,13,14 * page 23, line 6 - page 24, line 23; examples A,B * [I] 2-5,9,11,12,17 |