EP3311682 - ATOMISER AND AEROSOL GENERATING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.05.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Changzhou Jwei Intelligent Technology Co., Ltd. 4th Floor, No.7, Fengxiang Road Xuejia Town Xinbei District Changzhou, Jiangsu 213125 / CN | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIU, Weihua 4th Floor NO.7 Fengxiang Road Xuejia Town Xinbei District Changzhou Jiangsu 213125 / CN | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Zaboliene, Reda METIDA Law Firm Zaboliene and Partners Business center VERTAS Gyneju 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | Application number, filing date | 16811043.5 | 17.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016CN86294 | Priority number, date | CN201520431327U | 19.06.2015 Original published format: CN 201520431327 U | [2018/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016202302 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | ZH | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3311682 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 22.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A24F47/00, A61M15/06, A61M11/04 | [2019/02] | CPC: |
A61M15/06 (EP,KR,US);
A24F40/40 (KR);
A24F40/42 (US);
A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A61M11/042 (EP,KR,US);
B05B7/26 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2018/17] | A24F47/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Title | German: | ZERSTÄUBER UND AEROSOLERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2018/17] | English: | ATOMISER AND AEROSOL GENERATING APPARATUS | [2018/17] | French: | ATOMISEUR ET APPAREIL DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2018 | Translation filed | 17.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 17.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 29.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5687746 (ROSE JED E [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]GB2412876 (GASFLOW SERVICES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XI]CN104207330 (SHENZHEN BAUWAY TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-4,9-12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0028] - [0040] * [I] 5-8,13,14; | [XI]CN204217908U (HUIZHOU KIMREE TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-4,9-12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0085] * [I] 5-8,13,14 | International search | [A]CN103750571 (LIN GUANGRONG) [A] 1-20 * , the whole document *; | [XY]CN104203018 (PARK SUN SOON) [X] 11-14, 17-20 * , description, paragranh [0048], and figure 2, description, paragraphs [0029] and [0048]-[0051], and figure 2 * [Y] 1-7, 10, 15, 20; | [Y]CN104544575 (JOYE CHANGZHOU ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-7, 10, 15, 20 * , description, paragraphs [0030]-[0032] and [0041]-[0044], and figures 1-4 *; | [Y]CN204393353U (JOY CHANGZHOU ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 1-7, 10, 15, 20 * , description, paragraphs [0036]-[0052], and figures 1-8 *; | [PX]CN204796750U (JOYETECH CHANGZHOU ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [PX] 1-20 * , claims 1-10, description, paragraphs [0005]-[0014] and [0053]-[0078], and figures 1-11 *; | [A]EP2984952 (SHENZHEN FIRST UNION TECH CO [CN]) [A] 1-20* , the whole document * |