EP3307505 - ARTICLE OBTAINED BY INJECTION MOULDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/16] | COMPOSITIONS FOR INJECTION MOULDING | ||
[2021/41] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMERTECH SAS 43, quai de Grenelle 75015 Paris / FR | [2019/07] |
Former [2018/16] | For all designated states Imerys Minerals Limited Par Moor Centre Par Moor Road Par, Cornwall PL24 2SQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRING, George Birks 19 Dunnon Road Hartlepool TS25 4EF / GB | 02 /
MOLDOVAN, Daniel Gene 301 Clairhill Court Simpsonville, SC 29680 / US | 03 /
REBIH, Fatima 5 Rue de la Pomme 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2018/23] |
Former [2018/16] | 01 /
HERRING, George Birks 19 Dunnon Road Hartlepool TS25 4EF / GB | ||
02 /
MOLDOVAN, Daniel Gene 796 South Crest Road Chattanooga, TN 37404 / US | |||
03 /
REBIH, Fatima 16 Pagoda Drive Duporth St. Austell, Cornwall PL26 6AW / GB | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/10] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2018/16] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 16812224.0 | 14.06.2016 | [2018/16] | WO2016US37364 | Priority number, date | US201562175739P | 15.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562175739 P | [2018/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016205192 | Date: | 22.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3307505 | Date: | 18.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3307505 | Date: | 09.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/00, B29B7/00, B29B7/90, B29B9/06, C08K9/04, C08L23/06, // B29K105/26, B29K105/00, B29K509/00, B29K23/00, C08K3/013, C08K3/26, C08K5/14 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
C08K9/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/26 (KR,US);
B29B7/002 (EP,KR,US);
B29B7/90 (EP,KR,US);
B29B9/065 (EP,KR,US);
B29C45/0001 (US);
B29C45/0013 (EP,US);
C08J11/04 (KR,US);
C08J11/16 (US);
C08K3/04 (KR,US);
C08L23/06 (KR,US);
C08L23/12 (KR,US);
B29K2023/065 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0005 (US);
B29K2105/0094 (EP,US);
B29K2105/26 (EP,US);
B29K2509/00 (EP,US);
B29K2509/02 (US);
C08K2003/265 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2201/003 (EP,US);
C08K2201/005 (EP,KR,US);
C08K3/013 (EP,US);
C08K5/14 (EP,US);
C08L2205/025 (US);
C08L2205/06 (US);
C08L2207/062 (US);
C08L2207/20 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08K9/04, C08L23/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/09] | B29C45/00, C08K9/04, B29B7/90, B29B7/00, B29B9/06, // B29K105/26, B29K23/00, C08K5/14, C08K3/013 | ||
Former IPC [2018/16] | B29B7/90, B29B11/16, B29B15/08, B29C45/00, C08J11/04, C08J11/16, C08K3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRITZGEGOSSENER ARTIKEL | [2021/41] | English: | ARTICLE OBTAINED BY INJECTION MOULDING | [2021/41] | French: | ARTICLE OBTENU PAR MOULAGE PAR INJECTION | [2021/41] |
Former [2018/16] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM SPRITZGIESSEN | ||
Former [2018/16] | COMPOSITIONS FOR INJECTION MOULDING | ||
Former [2018/16] | COMPOSITIONS POUR MOULAGE PAR INJECTION | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 10.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/16] | 10.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.01.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 26.01.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.12.2022
08.12.2022
ADMISSIBLE Omya International AG Baslerstrasse 42 4665 Oftringen / CH Opponent's representative Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/02] | 23.12.2022 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 08.10.2023 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2024/07] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 26.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.02.2021 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.06.2016 | AL | 09.03.2022 | AT | 09.03.2022 | CY | 09.03.2022 | CZ | 09.03.2022 | DK | 09.03.2022 | EE | 09.03.2022 | FI | 09.03.2022 | HR | 09.03.2022 | LT | 09.03.2022 | LV | 09.03.2022 | MC | 09.03.2022 | MK | 09.03.2022 | MT | 09.03.2022 | PL | 09.03.2022 | RO | 09.03.2022 | RS | 09.03.2022 | SE | 09.03.2022 | SI | 09.03.2022 | SK | 09.03.2022 | SM | 09.03.2022 | TR | 09.03.2022 | BG | 09.06.2022 | NO | 09.06.2022 | GR | 10.06.2022 | LU | 14.06.2022 | CH | 30.06.2022 | LI | 30.06.2022 | IS | 09.07.2022 | PT | 11.07.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/32] | HU | 14.06.2016 | |
AL | 09.03.2022 | ||
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
TR | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
TR | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
MK | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CY | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
LU | 14.06.2022 | ||
CH | 30.06.2022 | ||
LI | 30.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SI | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
MC | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
DK | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 09.03.2022 | |
AT | 09.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
IS | 09.07.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
PL | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SK | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
CZ | 09.03.2022 | ||
EE | 09.03.2022 | ||
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 09.03.2022 | |
FI | 09.03.2022 | ||
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RO | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
SM | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
PT | 11.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 09.03.2022 | |
HR | 09.03.2022 | ||
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
LV | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
GR | 10.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 09.03.2022 | |
LT | 09.03.2022 | ||
RS | 09.03.2022 | ||
SE | 09.03.2022 | ||
BG | 09.06.2022 | ||
NO | 09.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 09.03.2022 | |
NO | 09.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1500673 (UBE INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0046] - [0050] *; | [XAI]JP2007291213 (UNIV TOKYO, et al) [X] 2,5-7 * claims 1-8 * * paragraphs [0012] , [0017] * [A] 1,4,11-15 [I] 3,8-10; | [XAI]EP2610290 (IMERYS MINERALS LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,5-9,15 * claims 1-15 * * paragraph [0052] * * examples 1,2 * [A] 4,11-14 [I] 10 | International search | [A]US6403692 (TRAUGOTT THOMAS D [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 5/1-4, 25-26, 27/25-26, 28/27/25-26 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US2006189761 (JIN YANG S [KR], et al) [Y] 4, 5/1-4 * ; paragraphs [0021], [0034]; claims 1, 5 *; | [XY]US2010234513 (MILESI DANIEL [FR], et al) [X] 1-3, 25-26 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0006], [0024], [0028]-[0029], [0044], [0047], [0050]-[0051] * [Y] 4, 5/1-4, 27/25-26, 28/27/25-26; | [A]US2011197788 (BRADSHAW HOWARD GRANT [US], et al) [A] 1-4, 5/1-4, 25-26, 27/25-26, 28/27/25-26 * ; entire document *; | [Y]US8067518 (DAVEY CHRISTOPHER R [US], et al) [Y] 27/25-26, 28/27/25-26 * ; abstract; column 12, lines 49-65; column 13, lines 8-15; tables 1, 3 *; | [A]US2012119414 (VAN HELDEN AREND KUINDERT [NL]) [A] 1-4, 5/1-4, 25-26, 27/25-26, 28/27/25-26 * ; entire document *; | [A]WO2014147106 (DINUNZIO GIUSEPPE [IT]) [A] 1-4, 5/1-4, 25-25, 27/25-20, 20/27/25-26* ; entire document * | Examination | WO2016038110 | Opposition | CN101210087 | US2009118398 | WO2012175504 | WO2016038110 | - L. LI et al., "Effect of Malonic Acid Treatment on Crystal Structure Melting Behavior Morphology and Mechanical Properties of Isotactic Polypropylene/Nano CaC03 Composites", Journal of Macromolecular Science, (20110000), vol. 50, pages 831 - 845, XP093011472 | - H. CHERAGHI et al., "Morphology and Mechanical Properties of PP/LLDPE Blends and Ternary PP/LLDPE/Nano-CaC03 Composites", Strength of Materials, (20130000), vol. 45, pages 730 - 738, XP055844721 | - Thumsorn S., Et Al., "Development of Cockleshell-Derived CaC03 for Flame Retardancy of Recycled PET/Recycled PP Blend", Materials Sciences and Applications, (20110000), vol. 2, pages 59 - 69, XP093011473 | - M. GAHLEITNER et al., "Polypropylene", Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, (20140000), pages 1 - 44, XP093011537 | - C. MAIER et al., "13 Processing fundamentals", Polypropylene. The Definitive User's Guide and Handbook, Norwich, Plastics Design Library, (19980000), pages 146 - 376, XP093011540 | - Anonymous, "HDPE Product Selection Guide", LYONDELLBASELL, (20150400), pages 1 - 2, XP093011545 | - Anonymous, "UNIPETROL Product Overview", PP MOSTEN, (20110400), pages 1 - 2, XP093011549 | - Anonymous, "Injection Molding Technical Guide", QENOS, (20140100), pages 1 - 30, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20140306140157/http://www.qenos.com/internet/home.nsf/(LUImages)/TG5Injection/$FiIe/TG5Injection.pdf, XP093011552 | - Anonymous, "Polyethylene Data Sheet", QENOS ALKATHENE, (20081114), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/ 20110219 112202/ http://www.qenos.com/internet/home . n sf/getP DS?OpenAgent&q =XDS34, XP093011554 | - Anonymous, "Injection moulding grades", QENOS ALKATHENE, (20110518), page 1, URL: https://web.archive.org/web/20110518175806/http://www.qenos.com/internet/home.nsf/web/CTHS-86Y8BP, XP093011559 |