EP3391064 - A METHOD OF LOCATING A FAULT IN A POWER TRANSMISSION MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Technology GmbH Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2018/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, Rosemary St. Leonards Avenue Stafford Staffordshire ST17 4LX / GB | [2018/43] | Representative(s) | Brevalex Tour Trinity 1 B Place de la Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2024/07] |
Former [2018/43] | Fischer, Michael Maria General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 16812702.5 | 07.12.2016 | [2018/43] | WO2016EP80030 | Priority number, date | GB20150022251 | 17.12.2015 Original published format: GB 201522251 | [2018/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017102488 | Date: | 22.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3391064 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3391064 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/08 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
G01R31/088 (EP,US);
G01R31/085 (GB,US);
G01R19/0038 (GB);
G01R31/086 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LOKALISIERUNG EINES FEHLERS IN EINEM LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGUNGSMEDIUM | [2018/43] | English: | A METHOD OF LOCATING A FAULT IN A POWER TRANSMISSION MEDIUM | [2018/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LOCALISATION D'UNE DÉFAILLANCE DANS UN MILIEU DE TRANSMISSION D'ÉNERGIE | [2018/43] | Entry into regional phase | 17.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 17.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/43] | 31.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.02.2024 | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 14.02.2024 | |
BG | 14.02.2024 | ||
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE3812432 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,8-10,17 * the whole document * [I] 2-7,11-16,18; | [A]EP2411823 (TECHIMP TECHNOLOGIES SRL [IT]) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [A] - XIE F ET AL, "Single-ended fault location method based on wavelet theory: Application to a double-circuit transmission line", 2013 48TH INTERNATIONAL UNIVERSITIES' POWER ENGINEERING CONFERENCE (UPEC), IEEE, (20130902), doi:10.1109/UPEC.2013.6714862, pages 1 - 6, XP032778157 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/UPEC.2013.6714862 | Examination | US2315450 |