EP3394498 - SHIP CONTAINMENT SYSTEM FOR LIQUIFIED GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAEED, Muhammad, Ahmer 80 Strand Westminister London WC2R 0ZA / GB | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Shell Legal Services IP PO Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16812761.1 | 20.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016EP81871 | Priority number, date | EP20150202067 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: EP 15202067 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017108756 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3394498 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3394498 | Date: | 29.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/00, B63B25/16, B63B3/68, F17C3/10 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
B63B25/16 (EP,KR);
B63B3/68 (EP,KR);
F17C3/025 (EP,KR);
F17C3/10 (EP);
B63B2025/087 (EP,KR);
F17C2201/01 (EP);
F17C2201/0128 (EP);
F17C2201/052 (EP);
F17C2203/0329 (EP);
F17C2203/0333 (EP);
F17C2203/0358 (EP);
F17C2203/0379 (EP,KR);
F17C2203/0617 (EP,KR);
F17C2205/0103 (EP);
F17C2205/0126 (EP);
F17C2205/0176 (EP);
F17C2205/0192 (EP);
F17C2209/221 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP,KR);
F17C2221/013 (KR);
F17C2221/033 (EP);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,KR);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
F17C2227/0135 (EP,KR);
F17C2227/0178 (EP);
F17C2250/043 (KR);
F17C2250/0439 (KR);
F17C2250/046 (KR);
F17C2260/033 (EP);
F17C2270/0105 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÜCKHALTESYSTEM FÜR VERFLÜSSIGTE GASE | [2019/31] | English: | SHIP CONTAINMENT SYSTEM FOR LIQUIFIED GASES | [2018/44] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONFINEMENT POUR GAZ LIQUÉFIÉS | [2019/33] |
Former [2018/44] | SCHIFFSSICHERHEITSHÜLLENSYSTEM FÜR VERFLÜSSIGTE GASE | ||
Former [2018/44] | SYSTÈME DE CONFINEMENT DE NAVIRE POUR GAZ LIQUÉFIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 12.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.12.2016 | AL | 29.01.2020 | AT | 29.01.2020 | CY | 29.01.2020 | CZ | 29.01.2020 | DK | 29.01.2020 | EE | 29.01.2020 | ES | 29.01.2020 | HR | 29.01.2020 | IT | 29.01.2020 | LT | 29.01.2020 | LV | 29.01.2020 | MC | 29.01.2020 | MK | 29.01.2020 | MT | 29.01.2020 | PL | 29.01.2020 | RS | 29.01.2020 | SE | 29.01.2020 | SI | 29.01.2020 | SK | 29.01.2020 | SM | 29.01.2020 | TR | 29.01.2020 | BG | 29.04.2020 | NO | 29.04.2020 | GR | 30.04.2020 | IS | 29.05.2020 | PT | 21.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 20.12.2016 | |
AL | 29.01.2020 | ||
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.12.2016 | |
AT | 29.01.2020 | ||
CY | 29.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
MT | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
TR | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 29.01.2020 | |
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
MC | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.01.2020 | |
CZ | 29.01.2020 | ||
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
IT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
PL | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SI | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
EE | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 29.01.2020 | |
DK | 29.01.2020 | ||
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SK | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
SM | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 29.01.2020 | |
ES | 29.01.2020 | ||
HR | 29.01.2020 | ||
LT | 29.01.2020 | ||
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | HR | 29.01.2020 | |
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
IS | 29.05.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | HR | 29.01.2020 | |
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
BG | 29.04.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | HR | 29.01.2020 | |
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
GR | 30.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | HR | 29.01.2020 | |
LV | 29.01.2020 | ||
RS | 29.01.2020 | ||
SE | 29.01.2020 | ||
NO | 29.04.2020 | ||
PT | 21.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | NO | 29.04.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2871669 (DOUGLAS MANN, et al) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 21 - line 51; figure - *; | [A]US2963873 (LEE STOWERS HERBERT) [A] 1 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 2; figure - *; | [AD]US3339515 (REED EDWIN E) [AD] 1-9 * column 1, line 25 - line 64 * * column 4, line 20 - line 27; figure - *; | [A]US6453680 (ALLEN MARK S [US]) [A] 2-9 * figure -; claim 18 *; | [AD]JP3401727B (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [AD] 1-9 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0014]; figures 1, 3 *; | [AD]WO2009147162 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [AD] 1-9 * page 1, line 15 - line 26 * * page 6, line 11 * * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 5; figures 1,3 *; | [AD]GB2523581 (MGI THERMO PTE LTD [SG]) [AD] 1-9 * page 11 - page 12; figure - *; | [A] - W. A. Amos, "Costs of Storing and Transporting Hydrogen", Costs of Storing and Transporting Hydrogen, doi:10.2172/6574, (19981130), URL: http://www1.eere.energy.gov/hydrogenandfuelcells/pdfs/25106.pdf, (20160617), XP055281520 [A] 7-9 * page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 33 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2172/6574 | [A] - JINSONG ZHANG ET AL, "A Review of Heat Transfer Issues in Hydrogen Storage Technologies", JOURNAL OF HEAT TRANSFER., US, (20050101), vol. 127, no. 12, doi:10.1115/1.2098875, ISSN 0022-1481, page 1391, XP055281503 [A] 7-9 * page 1394, column 1, paragraph last * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1115/1.2098875 | [A] - VARGHESE A P ET AL, "Transient shielded liquid hydrogen containers", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HYDROGEN ENERGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V., BARKING, GB, vol. 18, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0360-3199(93)90101-F, ISSN 0360-3199, (19930101), pages 39 - 44, (19930101), XP025651309 [A] 1-9 * page 41, paragraph 2; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0360-3199(93)90101-F | [A] - DAG PIKE, "First liquid hydrogen carrier", MOTORSHIP, NEXUS MEDIA COMMUNICATIONS, SWANLEY, KENT, GB, (20140601), vol. 95, no. 1116, ISSN 0027-2000, pages 44 - 45, XP001591806 [A] 1-7 * column 3; figure - * |