EP3334667 - MODULE FOR A MODULAR CONVEYOR BELT WITH A ROLLER CONVEYOR SURFACE AND MODULAR CONVEYOR BELT FORMED BY A PLURALITY OF SUCH MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Regina Catene Calibrate S.p.A. Via Chiaravalle 7 20122 Milano (MI) / IT | [2020/28] |
Former [2018/25] | For all designated states Regina Catene Calibrate S.p.A. Via San Barnaba 32 20122 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARBAGNATI, Carlo c/o REGINA CATENE CALIBRATE S.p.A. Via Monza 90 23870 Cernusco Lombardone (LC) / IT | 02 /
CATTANEO, Norberto c/o REGINA CATENE CALIBRATE S.p.A. Via Monza 90 23870 Cernusco Lombardone (LC) / IT | [2018/25] | Representative(s) | Cosenza, Simona, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [2018/25] | Application number, filing date | 16812819.7 | 27.09.2016 | [2018/25] | WO2016IB55775 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB03923 | 28.09.2015 Original published format: IT UB20153923 | [2018/25] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2017055999 | Date: | 06.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3334667 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3334667 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65G17/40 | [2018/25] | CPC: |
B65G17/40 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B65G17/083 (KR);
B65G17/24 (US);
B65G2207/30 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODUL FÜR EIN MODULARES FÖRDERBAND MIT EINER ROLLENFÖRDERFLÄCHE UND DURCH MEHRERE SOLCHER MODULE HERGESTELLTES MODULARES FÖRDERBAND | [2018/25] | English: | MODULE FOR A MODULAR CONVEYOR BELT WITH A ROLLER CONVEYOR SURFACE AND MODULAR CONVEYOR BELT FORMED BY A PLURALITY OF SUCH MODULES | [2018/25] | French: | MODULE POUR UNE COURROIE DE TRANSPORTEUR MODULAIRE COMPRENANT UNE SURFACE DE TRANSPORTEUR À ROULEAUX ET COURROIE DE TRANSPORTEUR MODULAIRE FORMÉE D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE TELS MODULES | [2018/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 15.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.11.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 16.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2019 | Decision despatched | 16.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2019 | Decision despatched | 16.01.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 16.01.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.02.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.09.2016 | AL | 29.07.2020 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | PL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | TR | 29.07.2020 | IE | 27.09.2020 | LU | 27.09.2020 | FR | 29.09.2020 | BE | 30.09.2020 | CH | 30.09.2020 | LI | 30.09.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | GB | 29.10.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 27.09.2016 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
TR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.09.2016 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MT | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
TR | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
GB | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
IE | 27.09.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
CH | 30.09.2020 | ||
LI | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
FR | 29.09.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 27.09.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/21] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1852942 (STREINE FRANK B) [Y] 1-17 * page 1, line 46 - page 2, line 34; figures 1-3; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]NL1010530C (MCC NEDERLAND [NL]) [Y] 1-17 * figure - *; | [A]WO2013030404 (REXNORD MARBETT SRL [IT], et al) [A] 10-12* figure 2 * |