EP3371426 - TANK COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/37] | TANK COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR EXHAUST-GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM OF INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINES | ||
[2023/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.09.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.05.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eltek S.p.A. Strada Valenza, 5A 15033 Casale Monferrato (AL) / IT | [2018/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARBANO, Alberto c/o ELTEK S.p.A. Strada Valenza 5A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | 02 /
BIZZARRO, Marco c/o ELTEK S.p.A. Strada Valenza 5A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | 03 /
ZORZETTO, Mauro c/o ELTEK S.p.A. Strada Valenza 5A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | 04 /
GADINI, Costanzo c/o ELTEK S.p.A. Strada Valenza 5A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | 05 /
PIZZI, Marco c/o ELTEK S.p.A. Strada Valenza 5A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | 06 /
MERLANO, Piercarlo c/o ELTEK S.p.A. Strada Valenza 5A I-15033 Casale Monferrato (Alessandria) / IT | [2018/37] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/47] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2018/37] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 16812849.4 | 31.10.2016 | [2018/37] | WO2016IB56559 | Priority number, date | IT2015UB05359 | 06.11.2015 Original published format: IT UB20155359 | [2018/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017077448 | Date: | 11.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3371426 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3371426 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/20, B60K15/03 | [2018/37] | CPC: |
B60K15/03177 (EP,US);
F01N3/2066 (EP,US);
F01N3/208 (US);
F01N3/24 (US);
B60K2015/0319 (EP,US);
B60K2015/0321 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03243 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03348 (EP,US);
B60K2015/03427 (EP,US);
F01N2560/08 (EP,US);
F01N2570/14 (US);
F01N2610/02 (EP,US);
F01N2610/10 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1406 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1413 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1433 (EP,US);
F01N2610/1446 (EP,US);
F01N2610/148 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TANKKOMPONENTE, INSBESONDERE FÜR ABGASBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTORS | [2018/37] | English: | TANK COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR EXHAUST GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM OF INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES | [2023/23] | French: | COMPOSANT DE RÉSERVOIR, EN PARTICULIER POUR SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT DE MOTEURS À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/37] | TANK COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR EXHAUST-GAS TREATMENT SYSTEM OF INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINES | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2018 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 23.03.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 22.11.2023 | ES | 22.11.2023 | HR | 22.11.2023 | PL | 22.11.2023 | RO | 22.11.2023 | RS | 22.11.2023 | SK | 22.11.2023 | SM | 22.11.2023 | NO | 22.02.2024 | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 22.11.2023 | |
ES | 22.11.2023 | ||
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RO | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
SM | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
PL | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 22.11.2023 | |
HR | 22.11.2023 | ||
RS | 22.11.2023 | ||
NO | 22.02.2024 | ||
GR | 23.02.2024 | ||
IS | 22.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 23.02.2024 | |
IS | 22.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]EP2029865 (INERGY AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS RES [BE]) [X] 16 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] * [A] 2-4,6-10,12 [Y] 5,11 [I] 1,13-15; | [YA]WO2013178307 (HYDAC ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5,11 * figure 5 * * page 9, lines 4-31 *[A] 1-4,6-10,12-16; | [IA]US2015075141 (BRUECK ROLF [DE], et al) [I] 1,12 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0047] * [A] 2-11,13,14 | Examination | EP2029865 | US2015122041 |