EP3394792 - OLED-ILLUMINATED SKIN PRINT SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/44] | OLED-ILLUMINATED PRINT SENSOR | ||
[2022/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.04.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Idemia Identity & Security France 11, boulevard Gallieni 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAINGUET, Jean-François 18 Rue Louvois 38100 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
BOUTET, Jérôme 48 Allée de la Chenevarie 38640 Claix / FR | 03 /
FOURRE, Joël Yann 30 Rue de Montval 78160 Marly Le Roi / FR | 04 /
TEMPLIER, François 17 Rue des Martyrs 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Brevalex 56, Boulevard de l'Embouchure B.P. 27519 31075 Toulouse Cedex 2 / FR | [2018/44] | Application number, filing date | 16812966.6 | 21.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016EP82062 | Priority number, date | FR20150063178 | 23.12.2015 Original published format: FR 1563178 | [2018/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017108881 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3394792 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3394792 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06V40/13, H01L27/32, H01L27/146 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
H01L27/14678 (EP,US);
H10K59/65 (EP,US);
G06V40/1318 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/15 (US)
|
Former IPC [2018/44] | G06K9/00, H01L27/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OLED-BELEUCHTETER HAUTABDRUCKSENSOR | [2022/15] | English: | OLED-ILLUMINATED SKIN PRINT SENSOR | [2022/15] | French: | CAPTEUR D'EMPREINTES À ECLAIRAGE OLED | [2022/15] |
Former [2018/44] | OLED-BELEUCHTETER DRUCKSENSOR | ||
Former [2018/44] | OLED-ILLUMINATED PRINT SENSOR | ||
Former [2018/44] | CAPTEUR D'EMPREINTES A ECLAIRAGE OLED | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 02.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.01.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2016 | AL | 24.08.2022 | AT | 24.08.2022 | BG | 24.08.2022 | CY | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | DK | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | ES | 24.08.2022 | FI | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | IT | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | MK | 24.08.2022 | MT | 24.08.2022 | NL | 24.08.2022 | PL | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SE | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | NO | 24.11.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IE | 21.12.2022 | LU | 21.12.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | PT | 26.12.2022 | BE | 31.12.2022 | CH | 31.12.2022 | LI | 31.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
BG | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/29] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/26] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
IT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.12.2016 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
BE | 31.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IE | 21.12.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
CH | 31.12.2022 | ||
LI | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
LU | 21.12.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
AT | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
DK | 24.08.2022 | ||
ES | 24.08.2022 | ||
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 24.08.2022 | |
FI | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
PL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | ||
PT | 26.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
NL | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SE | 24.08.2022 | ||
NO | 24.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [I]JP2003037708 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [I] 1-14* paragraph [0039]; figures 6(a), 6(b) *; | [IY]US2008317303 (KONNO YASUTAKA [JP], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0143]; figures 1,16,17 * [Y] 4-10; | [XY]US2012256089 (KANDA EIJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,12-14 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0078]; figures 1,2,5,9,11,13 * [Y] 4-10 |