EP3394322 - NITROGEN CONTAINING SINGLE CRYSTAL DIAMOND MATERIALS OPTIMIZED FOR MAGNETOMETRY APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.09.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Element Six Technologies Limited Global Innovation Centre Fermi Avenue Harwell Oxford Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | For all designated states Element Six Technologies US Corporation 3901 Burton Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | For all designated states Lew, Wilbur 17 Byron Drive Mount Laurel, New Jersey 08054 / US | For all designated states Bruce, Gregory Scott 1356 Clarke Road Abington, Pennsylvania 19001 / US | [2018/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEW, Wilbur 1356 Clarke Road Abington, Pennsylvania 19001 / US | 02 /
BRUCE, Gregory Scott 1356 Clarke Road Abington, Pennsylvania 19001 / US | 03 /
EDMONDS, Andrew Mark c/o Element Six Global Innovation Centre Fermi Avenue Harwell Campus Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | 04 /
MARKHAM, Matthew Lee c/o Element Six Global Innovation Centre Fermi Avenue Harwell Campus Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | 05 /
STACEY, Alastair Douglas c/o Element Six Global Innovation Centre Fermi Avenue Harwell Campus Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | 06 /
DHILLON, Harpreet Kaur c/o Element Six Global Innovation Centre Fermi Avenue Harwell Campus Didcot Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | [2018/44] | Representative(s) | Mitchell, Matthew Benedict David Element Six (UK) Limited Group Intellectual Property Global Innovation Centre Harwell Oxford Didcot, Oxfordshire OX11 0QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/44] | Mitchell, Matthew Benedict David, et al Element Six Limited Group Intellectual Property Fermi Avenue Harwell Campus Didcot, Oxon OX11 0QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 16813329.6 | 06.12.2016 | [2018/44] | WO2016US65091 | Priority number, date | GB20150022650 | 22.12.2015 Original published format: GB 201522650 | [2018/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017112399 | Date: | 29.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3394322 | Date: | 31.10.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/02, C30B29/04, C30B33/04 | [2018/44] | CPC: |
C30B29/04 (EP,US);
C30B25/02 (EP,US);
C30B30/04 (US);
C30B31/20 (US);
C30B33/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/44] | Title | German: | STICKSTOFFHALTIGE, FÜR MAGNETOMETRISCHE ANWENDUNGEN OPTIMIERTE EINZELKRISTALLDIAMANTMATERIALIEN | [2018/44] | English: | NITROGEN CONTAINING SINGLE CRYSTAL DIAMOND MATERIALS OPTIMIZED FOR MAGNETOMETRY APPLICATIONS | [2018/44] | French: | MATÉRIAUX EN DIAMANT MONOCRISTALLIN CONTENANT DE L'AZOTE OPTIMISÉS POUR DES APPLICATIONS DE MAGNÉTOMÉTRIE | [2018/44] | Entry into regional phase | 15.06.2018 | National basic fee paid | 15.06.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2018 | Examination requested [2018/44] | 15.06.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2010149775 (ELEMENT SIX LTD [GB], et al); | [X]GB2490589 (ELEMENT SIX LTD [GB]); | [X]GB2492822 (ELEMENT SIX LTD [GB]); |