EP3313152 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ORGANIC ELECTRONIC ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR FORMING ORGANIC THIN FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1 Shinkawa 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2018/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SASSA Shuichi c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 1-98, Kasugadenaka 3-chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5548558 / JP | 02 /
ROKUHARA Kouichi c/o SUMITOMO CHEMICAL COMPANY LIMITED 6 Kitahara Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-3294 / JP | [2018/17] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16814367.5 | 21.06.2016 | [2018/17] | WO2016JP68432 | Priority number, date | JP20150125055 | 22.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015125055 | [2018/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016208597 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | JA | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313152 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2018 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/56, H01L51/40, H01L51/48, B05D3/06, B05D7/00 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
B05D3/0263 (EP);
H10K77/111 (KR,US);
H10K71/40 (US);
B05D3/06 (US);
B05D7/00 (US);
B05D7/02 (EP);
B05D7/04 (EP);
B05D7/56 (EP);
C08G61/12 (US);
C09D165/00 (US);
C09D5/24 (US);
H01L29/786 (US);
H01L31/02 (US);
H01L31/10 (US);
H05B33/02 (US);
H05B33/10 (US);
H10K10/00 (US);
H10K50/171 (EP,KR,US);
H10K71/12 (EP,US);
H10K71/421 (EP,KR);
C08G2261/124 (US);
C08G2261/1412 (US);
C08G2261/148 (US);
C08G2261/18 (US);
C08G2261/228 (US);
C08G2261/312 (US);
C08G2261/3142 (US);
C08G2261/3162 (US);
C08G2261/512 (US);
C08G2261/95 (US);
H10K10/46 (EP,KR);
H10K10/466 (US);
H10K10/488 (US);
H10K10/84 (US);
H10K2101/00 (US);
H10K2101/10 (EP,KR);
H10K30/30 (EP,KR,US);
H10K30/50 (EP,KR);
H10K30/82 (US);
H10K50/11 (US);
H10K50/15 (EP,US);
H10K50/17 (US);
H10K50/81 (US);
H10K50/82 (US);
H10K50/844 (EP,KR);
H10K71/00 (US);
H10K85/111 (US);
H10K85/151 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/17] | H05B33/10, B05D3/06, B05D7/00, H01L21/336, H01L29/786, H01L31/02, H01L31/10, H01L51/05, H01L51/30, H01L51/48, H01L51/50, H05B33/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ORGANISCHEN ELEKTRONISCHEN ELEMENTS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ORGANISCHEN DÜNNSCHICHT | [2018/17] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING ORGANIC ELECTRONIC ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR FORMING ORGANIC THIN FILM | [2018/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTRONIQUE ORGANIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'UN FILM MINCE ORGANIQUE | [2018/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2018 | Translation filed | 16.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 16.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 16.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2013180036 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]); | [Y]JP2014229397 (KONICA MINOLTA INC); | [Y]WO2014208468 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2004127897 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]WO2006064792 (ULVAC INC [JP], et al); | [A]WO2006070713 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP], et al); | [A]JP2008091316 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [A]JP2008226642 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [XY]WO2013180036 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]); | [Y]JP2014209446 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [Y]WO2014208468 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]); | [PA]JP2015145927 (JSR CORP); | [PA]WO2016039129 (HERAEUS KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) |