Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10829591 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2020 | B2 | US2018162997 | 14.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662319465 | 07.04.2016 | US201562183324 | 23.06.2015 | WO2016US37750 | 16.06.2016 | US201615737388 | 16.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107735456B | Global Dossier | 15.06.2021 | B | CN107735456 | 23.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662319465 | 07.04.2016 | US201562183324 | 23.06.2015 | WO2016US37750 | 16.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2990404 | Global Dossier | 23.01.2024 | C | CA2990404 | 29.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662319465 | 07.04.2016 | US201562183324 | 23.06.2015 | WO2016US37750 | 16.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3313939 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2019 | A4 | EP3313939 | 02.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662319465 | 07.04.2016 | US201562183324 | 23.06.2015 | WO2016US37750 | 16.06.2016 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017016918 | 10.04.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US201662319465 | 07.04.2016 | US201562183324 | 23.06.2015 | WO2016US37750 | 16.06.2016 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016209691 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201662319465 | 07.04.2016 | US201562183324 | 23.06.2015 |