EP3313939 - LATEX PRODUCTS HAVING POLYMERS AND POLYMERIC ADDUCTS AS QUICK-SETTING ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.2023 [2023/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema, Inc. 900 First Avenue King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Kyu-Jun 105 Shurling Place Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | 02 /
HU, Rong 1253 Hill Hollow Way Apex, North Carolina 27523 / US | 03 /
KAUFMAN, Michael C. 1016 Kingsway Drive Apex, North Carolina 27502 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Killis, Andréas ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16815076.1 | 16.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US37750 | Priority number, date | US201562183324P | 23.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562183324 P | US201662319465P | 07.04.2016 Original published format: US 201662319465 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016209691 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313939 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C08L79/00, C08L79/02, C09D179/00, C09D179/02, C08G73/02, C08L25/08, C08L57/06, C09D125/08, C09D157/06, C09D5/33, C09D7/65, C09J11/08, C09J157/06, C08K5/17, C08L25/14, C09D133/06, C09D5/02 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
C08G73/024 (EP,US);
C08L25/08 (US);
C08L57/06 (US);
C08L79/02 (EP,US);
C09D125/08 (US);
C09D133/06 (EP,US);
C09D157/06 (US);
C09D5/004 (EP,US);
C09D5/024 (EP,US);
C09D7/65 (EP,US);
C09J11/08 (US);
C09J157/06 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L79/02, C08L21/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2019/11] | C08L79/00, C08L79/02, C09D179/00, C09D179/02, C08G73/02, C08L25/08, C08L57/06, C09D125/08, C09D157/06, C09D5/33, C09D7/65, C09J11/08, C09J157/06 | ||
Former IPC [2018/18] | C08L79/00, C08L79/02, C09D179/00, C09D179/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | LATEXPRODUKTE MIT POLYMEREN UND POLYMEREN ADDUKTEN ALS SCHNELLHÄRTENDE ADDITIVE | [2018/18] | English: | LATEX PRODUCTS HAVING POLYMERS AND POLYMERIC ADDUCTS AS QUICK-SETTING ADDITIVES | [2018/18] | French: | PRODUITS DE LATEX AYANT DES POLYMÈRES ET DES ADDUITS POLYMÈRES COMME ADDITIFS À PRISE RAPIDE | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2017 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2017 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 18.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/16] | 02.12.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0758660 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]) [A] 1-27 * page 2, line 35 - line 47 * * page 5, line 24 - line 30 ** examples 1-4 *; | [A]WO0222709 (EPOX LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-27 * example 1 * * page 2 * * page 8 *; | [A]WO2014060456 (BASF SE [DE]) [A] 1-27 * page 1 * * claim 1 * * page 13 * | International search | [A]US5804627 (LANDY FRANK [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 8-15, 17-22, 24-32 * entire document *; | [A]US2002177655 (PRATT CHARLES E [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 8-15, 17-22, 24-32 * entire document *; | [A]US2005032933 (HERMES ANN R [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 8-15, 17-22, 24-32 * entire document *; | [A] - VU et al., "Generation of a Focused Poly(amino ether) Library: Polymer-mediated Transgene Delivery and Gold-Nanorod based Theranostic Systems.", Theranostics, vol. 2, no. 12, (20120000), pages 1160 - 1173, URL: http://www.thno.org/v02p1160.htm, (20160726), XP055340038 [A] 1-6, 8-15, 17-22, 24-32 * entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7150/thno.4492 | by applicant | EP0758660 | US5804627 | WO0222709 | WO2014060456 |