24.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
08.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
22.12.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
25.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
13.01.2023 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] |
06.01.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.01.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
06.01.2023 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.08.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.07.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.06.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.10.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.07.2020 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2020 |
First examination report |
|
18.03.2020 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.10.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.07.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2019 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
01.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
01.03.2019 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.04.2019 [2019/14] |
31.08.2018 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
31.08.2018 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
10.08.2018 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.07.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2018 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
30.03.2018 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
30.03.2018 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] |
15.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.03.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.01.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
24.01.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.01.2017 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.12.2016 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|