Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10716718 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2020 | B2 | US2016374872 | 29.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615191872 | 24.06.2016 | US201562185305 | 26.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018518321 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39219 | 24.06.2016 | US201562185305 | 26.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108135763 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39219 | 24.06.2016 | US201562185305 | 26.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2990043 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39219 | 24.06.2016 | US201562185305 | 26.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3313345 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2023 | B1 | EP3313345 | 03.04.2019 | A4 | EP3313345 | 02.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39219 | 24.06.2016 | US201562185305 | 26.06.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2017016225 | 07.03.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016US39219 | 24.06.2016 | US201562185305 | 26.06.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2016210250 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201562185305 | 26.06.2015 |