EP3313529 - FUSED BICYCLIC PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dana Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, Massachusetts 02215 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAY, Nathanael, S. 26 Greenview Avenue Boston, MA 02130 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Tinghu 118 Franklin Street Apt. 2 Brookline, MA 02445 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | HGF Limited 4th Floor Merchant Exchange 17-19 Whitworth Street West Manchester M1 5WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16815397.1 | 24.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US39302 | Priority number, date | US201562185366P | 26.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562185366 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016210291 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313529 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2018 | Classification | IPC: | A61P35/02, C07D401/14, A61K31/506 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/166 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (EP,US);
A61K31/34 (EP,US);
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP,US);
C07D491/048 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/437, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | KONDENSIERTE BICYCLISCHE PYRIMIDINDERIVATE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/18] | English: | FUSED BICYCLIC PYRIMIDINE DERIVATIVES AND USES THEREOF | [2018/18] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE PYRIMIDINE BICYCLIQUES FUSIONNÉS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 25.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/16] | 10.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN103242341 (GUANGZHOU INST BIOMED & HEALTH) [I] 1-16* paragraphs [[0410]] , [ [0517]]; claim - *; | [XI]CN104177363 (JIANGSU SIMCERE PHARMACEUTICAL, et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [[374]] , [ [389]] , [ [464]]; claim -; compounds 27e, 28e, 38d * [I] 3-16 | International search | [Y]US2013040949 (GRAY NATHANAEL S [US], et al) [Y] 1-11, 12/1-11, 13/12/1-11,14/12/1-11, 15/12/1-11, 16/15/12/1-11, 17/12/1-11,18/12/1-11, 19/12/1-11, 20/19/12/1-11, 21/12/1-11, 22/12/1-11, 23/22/12/1-11, 24/12/1-11, 25/1-11, 26/25/1-11, 27/25/1-11, 2* ; paragraphs [0011], [0013]-[0016], [0019]-[0021], [0023], [0033], [0069], [0077], [0091] *; | [Y]WO2015058140 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [Y] 1-11, 12/1-11, 13/12/1-11, 14/12/1-11, 15/12/1-11, 16/15/12/1-11, 17/12/1-11, 18/12/1-11, 19/12/1-11, 20/19/12/1-11, 21/12/1-11, 22/12/1-11, 23/22/12/1-11, 24/12/1-11, 25/1-11, 26/25/1-11, 27/25/1-11, * ; paragraphs [0031], [0041], [0095] * |