EP3313691 - MOUNTING ARM ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Satterfield, Johnny A. 19841 Nordhoff Street Northridge, CA 91324 / US | [2022/28] |
Former [2018/18] | For all designated states Satterfield, Johnny A. 19841 Nordhoff Street Northridge, CA 91324 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2022/28] |
Former [2018/18] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 16815444.1 | 24.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US39402 | Priority number, date | US201562185170P | 26.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562185170 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016210355 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3313691 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3313691 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2016 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/06, B60N2/75 | [2019/20] | CPC: |
B64D11/00153 (EP,US);
B60N2/79 (EP,US);
B60N2/793 (US);
B64D11/06 (EP,US);
B64D11/0624 (EP,US);
B64D11/0627 (US);
|
Former IPC [2018/18] | B60N2/46, B64D11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MONTAGEARMANORDNUNG | [2018/18] | English: | MOUNTING ARM ASSEMBLY | [2018/18] | French: | ENSEMBLE BRAS DE SUPPORT | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 26.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 11.11.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2018 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.2018 | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.12.2019 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 10.02.2020 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2020/22] | 01.09.2020 | Resumption of proceedings | [2020/22] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.07.2022 | AT | 13.07.2022 | CZ | 13.07.2022 | DK | 13.07.2022 | EE | 13.07.2022 | ES | 13.07.2022 | FI | 13.07.2022 | HR | 13.07.2022 | IT | 13.07.2022 | LT | 13.07.2022 | LV | 13.07.2022 | MC | 13.07.2022 | PL | 13.07.2022 | RO | 13.07.2022 | RS | 13.07.2022 | SE | 13.07.2022 | SI | 13.07.2022 | SK | 13.07.2022 | SM | 13.07.2022 | NO | 13.10.2022 | GR | 14.10.2022 | IS | 13.11.2022 | PT | 14.11.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/09] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
MC | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SI | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 13.07.2022 | |
AT | 13.07.2022 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
EE | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SK | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 13.07.2022 | |
CZ | 13.07.2022 | ||
DK | 13.07.2022 | ||
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RO | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 13.07.2022 | |
ES | 13.07.2022 | ||
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
SM | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
IS | 13.11.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
PL | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
HR | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
GR | 14.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
LV | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | ||
PT | 14.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | ES | 13.07.2022 | |
FI | 13.07.2022 | ||
LT | 13.07.2022 | ||
RS | 13.07.2022 | ||
SE | 13.07.2022 | ||
NO | 13.10.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5398991 (SMITH ALAN C [US], et al) [X] 1-11,14 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 30; figures 1-5 * [I] 12,13,15; | [XI]US5547248 (MARECHAL ROBERT R [FR]) [X] 1-4,7-11,14 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-3 * [I] 13; | [XI]US2002163215 (EMERLING DAVID M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-11,14,15 * paragraphs [0055] - [0060]; figures 10-16 * [I] 13; | [XI]US7431365 (STURT ALAN [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-10,13-15 * column 3, line 64 - column 4, line 37; figures 5-7 * [I] 11,12; | [XI]WO2013190153 (GARCIA SIERRA ROBERTO [ES]) [X] 1-4,7-10,14 * paragraphs [0029] - [0036]; figures 1-3 * [I] 13; | [XI]CN103991395 (WANG ZILU) [X] 1-4,7-11,14 * figures 1-5 *[I] 13,15 | International search | [XY]US5398991 (SMITH ALAN C [US], et al) [X] 1, 5-7, 10-11, 14 * ; figures 1-6, 9A-9E, columns 2-4, 6, 8, 9 * [Y] 1, 9, 12, 13, 15; | [Y]US2006242671 (VITITO CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [Y] 9, 15* ; figures 1-3, paragraphs [0011], [0026]-[0032] *; | [X]WO2013190153 (GARCIA SIERRA ROBERTO [ES]) [X] 1-4, 8 * ; page 3, figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US2015048230 (SATTERFIELD JOHNNY A [US]) [Y] 1, 12, 13 * ; figures 1, 3, paragraphs [0007] [0022]-[0027] * | Examination | WO2014049072 | by applicant | US5398991 | US7431365 | WO2014049072 |