EP3313416 - GENETICALLY MODIFIED IPS CELLS THAT CARRY A MARKER TO REPORT EXPRESSION OF NEUROGENIN3, TPH2, FOXO1 AND/OR INSULIN GENES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.01.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.02.2020 [2020/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York Office Of The General Counsel 412 Low Memorial Library, Mail Code 4308 535 West 116th Street New York, NY 10027 / US | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ACCILI, Domenico 80 Chambers St. ,15A New York, New York 10007 / US | [2018/18] | Representative(s) | Chapman, Paul Gilmour, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 40 Torphichen Street Edinburgh EH3 8JB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/18] | Chapman, Paul Gilmour Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16815487.0 | 27.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016US39569 | Priority number, date | US201562185555P | 26.06.2015 Original published format: US 201562185555 P | [2018/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2016210416 | Date: | 29.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3313416 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.02.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/12, A61K35/39, C12N5/071, C12N15/113, C12Q1/68 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
C12N5/0696 (EP,US);
C12N5/0679 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6897 (EP,US);
C12N2310/20 (US);
C12N2501/727 (EP,US);
C12N2506/45 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Title | German: | GENETISCH MODIFIZIERTE IPS-ZELLEN MIT EINEM MARKER FÜR DIE EXPRESSION VON NEUROGENIN3-, TPH2-, FOXO1- UND/ODER INSULINGENEN | [2018/18] | English: | GENETICALLY MODIFIED IPS CELLS THAT CARRY A MARKER TO REPORT EXPRESSION OF NEUROGENIN3, TPH2, FOXO1 AND/OR INSULIN GENES | [2018/18] | French: | CELLULES IPS GÉNÉTIQUEMENT MODIFIÉES PORTANT UN MARQUEUR POUR SIGNALER L'EXPRESSION DE GÈNES DE NEUROGENIN3, TPH2, FOXO1 ET/OU D'INSULINE | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 11.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/07] | 24.09.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI] - MICALLEF S J ET AL, "human embryonic stem cells facilitate isolation of in vitro derived insulin-producing cells", DIABETOLOGIA ; CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL DIABETES AND METABOLISM, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20111126), vol. 55, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S00125-011-2379-Y, ISSN 1432-0428, pages 694 - 706, XP035009998 [X] 1,6,9,12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,15 [I] 2,3,5,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00125-011-2379-y | [XYI] - AHMI BEN-YEHUDAH ET AL, "Evaluating Protocols for Embryonic Stem Cell Differentiation into Insulin-Secreting [beta]-Cells Using Insulin II-GFP as a Specific and Noninvasive Reporter", CLONING AND STEM CELLS, US, (20090601), vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1089/clo.2008.0074, ISSN 1536-2302, pages 245 - 257, XP055540451 [X] 1,6,9,12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,15 [I] 2,3,5,11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/clo.2008.0074 | [XYI] - HAISONG LIU ET AL, "Systematically labeling developmental stage-specific genes for the study of pancreatic β-cell differentiation from human embryonic stem cells", CELL RESEARCH - XIBAO YANJIU, GB, CN, (20140905), vol. 24, no. 10, doi:10.1038/cr.2014.118, ISSN 1001-0602, pages 1181 - 1200, XP055392960 [X] 1-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7,8,15 [I] 9-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/cr.2014.118 | [Y] - KAI LI ET AL, "Optimization of Genome Engineering Approaches with the CRISPR/Cas9 System", PLOS ONE, (20140828), vol. 9, no. 8, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0105779, page e105779, XP055243646 [Y] 7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0105779 | [Y] - RYOTARO BOUCHI ET AL, "FOXO1 inhibition yields functional insulin-producing cells in human gut organoid cultures", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20140630), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/ncomms5242, XP055426778 [Y] 15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms5242 | International search | [Y]US2013216554 (TALCHAI CHUTIMA [US], et al) [Y] 21-23, 25, 27 * entire document *; | [A]WO2014153620 (UNIV WESTERN AUSTRALIA [AU], et al) [A] 1-19, 21-33* entire document *; | [A]US2015020223 (ZHANG FENG [US], et al) [A] 1-19, 21-33 * entire document *; | [XY] - MELLITZER et al., "Pancreatic islet progenitor cells in neurogenin 3-yellow fluorescent protein knock-add-on mice", Mol Endocrinol, (20040805), vol. 18, pages 2765 - 76, XP002476714 [X] 1, 3, 5, 6, 8-12, 14-16 * . entire document * [Y] 21-23, 25, 27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/me.2004-0243 | [A] - MALI et al., "RNA-guided human genome engineering via Cas9", Science, (20130103), vol. 339, pages 823 - 6, XP055362871 [A] 1-19, 21-33 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1232033 | [A] - TALCHAI et al., "Generation of functional insulin-producing cells in the gut by Foxo1 ablation", Nat Genet, (20120311), vol. 44, pages 406 - 12, XP055145152 [A] 1-19, 21-33 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ng.2215 |