|
24.11.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
31.07.2020 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
13.07.2020 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.2020 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Enquiry as to the processing of the file |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2018 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.07.2018 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Priority search results |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
31 |
|
31.05.2018 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
31.05.2018 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
13.04.2018 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
22.02.2018 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
22.02.2018 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
22.02.2018 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
22.02.2018 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
22.02.2018 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/408 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Written opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Written opinion - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Written opinion - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.12.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.12.2017 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.12.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
5 |
|
19.12.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
19.12.2017 |
Reply to communication PCT/IPEA/405 |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
27.11.2017 |
Non-unity - restrict claims/pay fees - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
30.10.2017 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.2017 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
04.10.2017 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
26.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.09.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
26.09.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
6 |
|
26.09.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
11 |
|
26.09.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
12 |
|
26.09.2017 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - description |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
7 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Reply to International Search Opinion |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
8 |
|
27.06.2017 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2017 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
24.03.2017 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Incoming letter related to PCT RO |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
13.12.2016 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
31 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
2 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Electronic request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |