Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN108698340B | Global Dossier | 28.04.2020 | B | CN108698340 | 23.10.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP79629 | 02.12.2016 | DE102015120969 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3383629 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2021 | B1 | EP3383629 | 10.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP79629 | 02.12.2016 | DE102015120969 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2864830T | 14.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2016EP79629 | 02.12.2016 | DE102015120969 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3383629T | 12.07.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP16815750 | 02.12.2016 | WO2016EP79629 | 02.12.2016 | DE102015120969 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2017093506 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015120969 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102015120969 | 08.06.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102015120969 | 02.12.2015 | Type | Divisional application | Application deemed to be withdrawn : 20.01.2021 |