EP3315811 - ELASTIC MEMBER AND WIRE ROD FOR ELASTIC MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NHK Spring Co., Ltd. 3-10, Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2018/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZAMA, Toshio c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 02 /
TAKAMURA, Noritoshi c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD. 3131 Miyadamura Kamiina-gun Nagano 399-4301 / JP | 03 /
ISHIKAWA, Shigeki c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 04 /
SUZUKI, Takeshi c/o NHK SPRING CO., LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2019/45] |
Former [2018/18] | 01 /
KAZAMA, Toshio c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAMURA, Noritoshi c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3131 Miyadamura Kamiina-gun Nagano 399-4301 / JP | |||
03 /
ISHIKAWA, Shigeki c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | |||
04 /
SUZUKI, Takeshi c/o NHK SPRING CO. LTD. 3-10 Fukuura Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2018/18] | Application number, filing date | 16817914.1 | 28.06.2016 | [2018/18] | WO2016JP69142 | Priority number, date | JP20150130303 | 29.06.2015 Original published format: JP 2015130303 | [2018/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017002806 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3315811 | Date: | 02.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3315811 | Date: | 06.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/02, C22C21/00, F16F1/06, F16F1/14 | [2018/18] | CPC: |
F16F1/024 (EP,US);
F16F1/021 (EP,CN,US);
B60G11/14 (EP,US);
B60G11/18 (EP,US);
B60G15/068 (CN);
B60G21/055 (EP,US);
B60G21/0551 (US);
C22C21/00 (US);
C22C21/06 (EP,US);
C22C21/10 (EP,CN,US);
F16F1/06 (EP,CN,US);
F16F1/14 (EP,CN,US);
B60G2202/12 (EP,US);
B60G2202/134 (EP,US);
B60G2202/135 (EP,US);
B60G2204/1222 (US);
B60G2204/129 (CN);
B60G2206/426 (EP,US);
B60G2206/427 (EP,US);
B60G2206/70 (CN);
B60G2206/7102 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELASTISCHES ELEMENT UND DRAHTSTANGE FÜR ELASTISCHES ELEMENT | [2018/18] | English: | ELASTIC MEMBER AND WIRE ROD FOR ELASTIC MEMBER | [2018/18] | French: | ÉLÉMENT ÉLASTIQUE ET TIGE DE FIL POUR ÉLÉMENT ÉLASTIQUE | [2018/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.01.2018 | Translation filed | 22.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 22.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 22.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/18] | 22.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.05.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2016 | AL | 06.11.2019 | AT | 06.11.2019 | CY | 06.11.2019 | CZ | 06.11.2019 | DK | 06.11.2019 | EE | 06.11.2019 | FI | 06.11.2019 | HR | 06.11.2019 | LT | 06.11.2019 | LV | 06.11.2019 | MC | 06.11.2019 | MK | 06.11.2019 | MT | 06.11.2019 | NL | 06.11.2019 | PL | 06.11.2019 | RO | 06.11.2019 | RS | 06.11.2019 | SI | 06.11.2019 | SK | 06.11.2019 | SM | 06.11.2019 | TR | 06.11.2019 | BG | 06.02.2020 | NO | 06.02.2020 | GR | 07.02.2020 | IS | 06.03.2020 | PT | 06.03.2020 | IE | 28.06.2020 | LU | 28.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 28.06.2016 | |
AL | 06.11.2019 | ||
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CY | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
MT | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
TR | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
IE | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
IE | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
IE | 28.06.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
LU | 28.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
MC | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
AT | 06.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SI | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
SK | 06.11.2019 | ||
SM | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
DK | 06.11.2019 | ||
EE | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
CZ | 06.11.2019 | ||
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RO | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 06.11.2019 | |
FI | 06.11.2019 | ||
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
HR | 06.11.2019 | ||
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
RS | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
IS | 06.03.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
LV | 06.11.2019 | ||
NL | 06.11.2019 | ||
PL | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
GR | 07.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 06.11.2019 | |
LT | 06.11.2019 | ||
BG | 06.02.2020 | ||
NO | 06.02.2020 | ||
PT | 06.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 06.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10196697 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]FR2788317 (PECHINEY RHENALU [FR]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]JP2004353080 (MITSUBISHI ALUMINIUM) [A] 1-7* abstract *; | [A]CN101608678 (HWAN CHEE METAL CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US2010289198 (BALSELLS PETE [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH10196697 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraph [0011] (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH11230221 (IHARA KOGYO KK, et al) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0010] to [0018]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000328209 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0012] to [0048]; fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]CN101608678 (HWAN CHEE METAL CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-7 * , page 6, line 1 to page 7, line 24; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2012055489 (DAIMLER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * , page 7, line 13 to page 10, line 15; fig. 1 to 4 & DE 102010053731 A1 *; | [A]JP2012525555 (Bal Seal Engineering, Inc.) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0002] to [0030]; fig. 1 to 7D & US 2010/0289198 A1 paragraphs [0002] to [0059]; fig. 1 to 7D & WO 2010/129293 A2 & CN 102414470 A *; | [A]JP5335056B (Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd.) [A] 1-7* , paragraphs [0025] to [0071] & CN 103339276 A & KR 10-2013-0121927 A *; | [A]CN203979232U (WENZHOU TIANLI SPRING CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0003] to [0020]; fig. 1 to 3 (Family: none) * |