EP3319161 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maxell Holdings, Ltd. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun Kyoto 618-8525 / JP | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATAKEYAMA, Atsushi c/o MAXELL, LTD 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | 02 /
MORIKAMI, Hidetoshi c/o MAXELL, LTD 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | 03 /
MASAOKA, Yasunori c/o MAXELL, LTD 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | 04 /
KAMINE, Hirokazu c/o MAXELL, LTD 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | 05 /
MATSUMOTO, Hiroaki c/o MAXELL, LTD. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | 06 /
KISHIMI, Mitsuhiro c/o MAXELL, LTD 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/25] | 01 /
HATAKEYAMA, Atsushi C/O MAXELL HOLDINGS, LTD. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIKAMI, Hidetoshi C/O MAXELL HOLDINGS, LTD. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | |||
03 /
MASAOKA, Yasunori C/O MAXELL HOLDINGS, LTD. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | |||
04 /
KAMINE, Hirokazu C/O MAXELL HOLDINGS, LTD. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | |||
05 /
MATSUMOTO, Hiroaki C/O MAXELL HOLDINGS, LTD. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | |||
06 /
KISHIMI, Mitsuhiro C/O MAXELL HOLDINGS, LTD. 1, Koizumi, Oyamazaki Oyamazaki-cho Otokuni-gun, Kyoto, 618-8525 / JP | |||
Former [2018/19] | 01 /
HATAKEYAMA, Atsushi C/O HITACH MAXELL LTD. 1-88 Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8567 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIKAMI, Hidetoshi C/O HITACH MAXELL LTD. 1-88 Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8567 / JP | |||
03 /
MASAOKA, Yasunori C/O HITACH MAXELL LTD. 1-88 Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8567 / JP | |||
04 /
KAMINE, Hirokazu C/O HITACH MAXELL LTD. 1-88 Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8567 / JP | |||
05 /
MATSUMOTO, Hiroaki C/O HITACH MAXELL LTD. 1-88 Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8567 / JP | |||
06 /
KISHIMI, Mitsuhiro C/O HITACH MAXELL LTD. 1-88 Ushitora 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8567 / JP | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/19] | Diehl & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Erika-Mann-Strasse 9 80636 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16818089.1 | 04.07.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016JP69757 | Priority number, date | JP20150133630 | 02.07.2015 Original published format: JP 2015133630 | JP20160021451 | 08.02.2016 Original published format: JP 2016021451 | JP20160069181 | 30.03.2016 Original published format: JP 2016069181 | [2018/19] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017002981 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | JA | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3319161 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/052, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0567, H01M4/38, H01M4/46 | [2019/13] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (US);
H01M4/134 (US);
H01M4/38 (EP,US);
H01M4/382 (EP,US);
H01M4/463 (EP,US);
H01M4/623 (US);
H01M6/16 (US);
H01M2004/027 (EP,US);
H01M2004/028 (US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/19] | H01M10/052, H01M4/134, H01M10/0567, H01M10/0568, H01M10/0569, H01M6/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Title | German: | BATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEN ELEKTROLYTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2018/19] | English: | NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE BATTERY AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2018/19] | French: | BATTERIE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER CETTE DERNIÈRE | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2018 | Translation filed | 11.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 11.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/14] | 12.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0918364 (GREATBATCH W LTD [US]) [X] 1,2,6,7 * claims 3,4,9,12 * [I] 4,5; | [A]US2003162100 (TAKAHASHI YASUFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0044]; example 14 *; | [A]EP2503633 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0057]; claim 2 *; | [E]EP3332993 (MAXELL HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [E] 1-3,6,7 * example 2 * | International search | [XA]JP2014137996 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD) [X] 1, 3, 7, 8 * , example 1 & US 2014/0199602 A1 example 1 & EP 2757626 A1 & CN 103928708 A & KR 10-2014-0092746 A * [A] 2, 4-6; | [XA]JP2014522078 (Asahi Kasei Corp.) [X] 1, 3, 7, 8 * , examples & US 2012/0315536 A1 examples & WO 2012/170693 A1 & EP 2719010 A & KR 10-2014-0020328 A & CN 104025353 A * [A] 2, 4-6; | [XA]JP2007123097 (SONY CORP) [X] 1, 3, 7, 8 * , examples (Family: none) * [A] 2, 4-6; | [A]JP2001319685 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-8 * , & US 6379846 B1 & EP 1037293 A1 *; | [A]JP2015072858 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [A] 1-8 * , (Family: none) * |