EP3317835 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FRAUD CONTROL BASED ON GEOLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mastercard International Incorporated 2000 Purchase Street Purchase, New York 10577 / US | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHALA, Amyn 8 Reynold Court Edison, NJ 08820 / US | 02 /
PEYTON, Kimberly, Lewis 405 W 23rd Street Apt 12g New York, NY 10011 / US | 03 /
MATTINGLY, Timothy 14055 Baywood Villages Drive Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 04 /
DELPERDANGE, Alain Rue Du Baukion 19 1370 Jodoigne-Souveraine / BE | 05 /
STEENBEEK, Dominique Chemin Du Pauvre Diable 6 1300 Wavre Walloon Brabant / BE | 06 /
COBURN, Gregory 2 Ormond Road Drumcondra Dublin 9 / IE | 07 /
RASSBACH, Susan 2048 Fenwick Place Arnold, MO 63010 / US | 08 /
SAVOYE, Mark, N. 100 East Hartsdale Avenue Apt. 4je Hartsdale, NY 10530 / US | 09 /
DESSY, Benjamin Rue Du Treuil 10 1341 Ceroux-Mousty / BE | 10 /
RANDELL, Karen 165 Brushy Brook Drive O'fallon, MO 63366 / US | 11 /
DICKINSON, Bradley 111 Cloverleaf Meadows Court O'fallon, MO 63366 / US | 12 /
SIDHU, Navjot 9 Dellwood Lane Ardsley, NY 10502 / US | 13 /
HIVELY, Corey 204 Greengate Drive O'fallon, MO 63367 / US | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/19] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 16818405.9 | 25.05.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016US34033 | Priority number, date | US201514755262 | 30.06.2015 Original published format: US201514755262 | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017003591 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3317835 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q20/40 | [2018/19] | CPC: |
G06Q20/3224 (EP,US);
G06Q20/34 (EP,US);
G06Q20/4016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BETRUGSKONTROLLE AUF BASIS VON GEOLOKALISIERUNG | [2018/19] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FRAUD CONTROL BASED ON GEOLOCATION | [2018/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE LUTTE CONTRE LA FRAUDE BASÉS SUR LA GÉOLOCALISATION | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2017 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 21.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/08] | 02.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2010274691 (HAMMAD AYMAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0097] - [0112] *; | [I]US2010299262 (HANDLER BRAD [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0061] - [0069] *; | [I]US2015012436 (POOLE THOMAS S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0079] - [0093] *; | [I]US2015081349 (JOHNDROW COLETTE MICHELE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0054] - [0060] - [0262] - [0319] * | International search | [Y]US2002020741 (SAKAGUCHI IKUO [JP]) [Y] 4, 14 * , paragraphs [0033]-[0042], figure & JP 2002-55960 A, abstract, paragraphs [0014]-[0023], figure 1 & GB 2370398 B & CN 1338694 A *; | [Y]US2002130176 (SUZUKI KOJI [JP]) [Y] 4, 14 * , abstract, figure 1 & JP 2002-269350 A *; | [Y]JP2002352165 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [Y] 4, 14 * , abstract, figure 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007094874 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-20* , paragraphs [0021]-[0125], figures 1-9 (Family: none) *; | [XY]JP2012185735 (JAPAN RES INST LTD) [X] 1-3, 5-13, 15-20 * , paragraphs [0008], [0050] (Family: none) * [Y] 4, 14 |