EP3317155 - AUTOMATED VEHICLE RESPONSE TO IMMINENT REAR-END COLLISION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.01.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aptiv Technologies Limited Erin Court Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | [2018/51] |
Former [2018/19] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052, M/C: 483-400-402 Troy, MI 48007-5052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUR, Michael, H. 21991 Grass Valley Mission Viejo, CA 92692 / US | 02 /
VIJAYAN, Indu 555 E. Washington Avenue - Apt. 703 Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/19] | Robert, Vincent APTIV - Service Brevets Bâtiment Le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 16818449.7 | 16.06.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016US37751 | Priority number, date | US201514789285 | 01.07.2015 Original published format: US201514789285 | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017003704 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3317155 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/09, B60W10/04, B60W10/18, B60W10/20, B60R21/0134, B60W30/095, B60W50/08 | [2019/09] | CPC: |
B60W30/09 (EP,US);
B60W10/18 (EP,US);
B60W10/20 (EP,US);
B60W30/0953 (EP,US);
B60W30/0956 (EP,US);
B60W50/087 (EP,US);
B60W2554/80 (EP,US);
B60W2554/801 (EP,US);
B60W2555/60 (EP,US);
B60W2710/182 (EP,US);
B60W2720/106 (EP,US);
B60W2720/12 (EP,US);
B60W2754/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2018/19] | B60W30/09, B60W10/04, B60W10/18, B60W10/20, B60R21/0134 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE FAHRZEUGREAKTION AUF DROHENDEN AUFFAHRUNFALL | [2018/19] | English: | AUTOMATED VEHICLE RESPONSE TO IMMINENT REAR-END COLLISION | [2018/19] | French: | RÉPONSE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMATIQUE À UNE COLLISION PAR L'ARRIÈRE IMMINENTE | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2018 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2018 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 27.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/09] | 07.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102009025607 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 3,10 * claims 1,6 *; | [Y]DE102010008208 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [Y] 8* paragraphs [0004] - [0009] *; | [X]DE102010001304 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0011] , [0019] , [0022] , [0032] - [0034]; figures 2a,b *; | [X]DE102012211509 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,4-7,9,11-13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] , [0010] , [0014] , [0015]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2014309884 (WOLF JOHANNES [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,9,11 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0010] , [0015] , [0021] *; | [XI]WO2015040634 (PRASAD MUTHUKUMAR [IN]) [X] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0007] , [0009] , [0020] , [0022] , [0025]; figure 6b * [I] 4,11; | [XAY]DE102014013544 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0008] , [0010] , [0012] , [0015] , [0027] * [A] 2,4-7,11-13 [Y] 3,8,10 | International search | [Y]JP2003081074 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 6, 14 * See paragraph [0017], claim 2, and figure 2. *; | [XYA]JP2006082644 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1, 2, 10 * See paragraphs [0019]-[0025], [0028]-[0030], [0037], [0038] and figures 1, 2, 4. * [Y] 5, 6, 9, 13, 14 [A] 3, 4, 7, 8, 11, 12, 15; | [Y]JP2007186141 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 5, 13 * See paragraph [0066] and figures 3, 4. *; | [A]US2009265107 (MATSUNO KOJI [JP]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0019], [0027], [0032] and figures 1, 2. *; | [Y]WO2014075783 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 9 * See abstract and figure 1. * |