EP3316879 - DIACEREIN OR RHEIN TOPICAL FORMULATIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TWI Biotechnology, Inc. 4F., No. 41, Lane 221 Kang Chien Road Nei Hu District Taipei 114 / TW | [2018/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, III, Carl, Oscar 13034 Alora Point San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Chih-Kuang 8F, No.41 Lane 221 Kang Chien Road Nei Hu Dist. Taipei 114 / TW | 03 /
LEE, Jing-Yi 8F, No.41 Lane 221 Kang Chien Road Nei Hu Dist. Taipei 114 / TW | 04 /
LU, Wei-Shu 8F, No.41 Lane 221 Kang Chien Road Nei Hu Dist. Taipei 114 / TW | [2018/19] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/19] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16818753.2 | 30.06.2016 | [2018/19] | WO2016US40287 | Priority number, date | US201562187743P | 01.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562187743 P | [2018/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017004319 | Date: | 05.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3316879 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.01.2017 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/10, A61K9/06, A61K31/192, A61K31/235 | [2019/04] | CPC: |
A61K9/06 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/222 (CN);
A61K31/192 (CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/225 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/235 (CN);
A61K47/10 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/14 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/183 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/26 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,IL,US);
A61K47/44 (EP,IL,US);
A61P17/00 (EP,CN,IL);
A61P17/02 (EP,CN,IL);
A61P17/04 (EP,CN,IL);
A61P17/06 (EP,CN,IL);
A61P17/10 (EP,CN,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,CN,IL,KR);
A61P19/06 (EP,CN,IL);
A61P25/02 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/10 (EP,CN,IL);
A61P37/08 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2018/19] | A61K31/192, A61K31/235 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/19] | Title | German: | TOPISCHE DIACEREIN- ODER RHEINFORMULIERUNGEN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2018/19] | English: | DIACEREIN OR RHEIN TOPICAL FORMULATIONS AND USES THEREOF | [2018/19] | French: | FORMULATIONS TOPIQUES DE RHÉINE OU DE DIACÉRÉINE, ET UTILISATIONS DE CELLES-CI | [2018/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2018 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2018 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/19] | 09.01.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.07.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6124358 (ESTANOVE CYRIL [FR], et al); | [A]EP2464248 (EXPANSCIENCE LAB [FR]); | [I]US2014163217 (MOELLER MICHAEL [CH], et al) | International search | [Y]WO2006029189 (MORGAN CLYDE [US]); | [A]US2009093509 (NAZIR TAHIR [GB], et al); | [Y]WO2009133430 (WOCKHARDT RESEARCH CENTER [IN], et al); | [Y]US2010285114 (DABRE RAHUL [IN], et al); | [Y]US2013156857 (GAO DANCHEN [US], et al) | by applicant | US6124358 | WO2006029189 | WO2009133430 | US2010285114 | US2013156857 | US8536152 | US2014163217 | US8865689 |