EP3397656 - ELECTRICALLY ACTIVE HYDROPHILIC BIO-POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.12.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Superdielectrics Ltd Tan House 15 South End Bassingbourn Royston, Hertfordshire SG8 5NJ / GB | [2018/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGHGATE, Donald James C/O Augmented Optics Limited Tan House 15 South End Royston Hertfordshire SG8 5NJ / GB | [2018/45] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2018/45] | Application number, filing date | 16819354.8 | 30.11.2016 | [2018/45] | WO2016GB53751 | Priority number, date | GB20150023102 | 30.12.2015 Original published format: GB 201523102 | [2018/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017115064 | Date: | 06.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3397656 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.07.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3397656 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/44, C08F226/10, A61L27/50, A61L27/16 | [2018/45] | CPC: |
C08F2/44 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C08F226/10 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61L27/16 (KR,RU,US);
A61B5/14532 (US);
A61B5/1468 (US);
A61L27/50 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61N1/36038 (RU,US);
A61N1/3605 (RU,US);
A61N1/362 (RU,US);
A61N1/375 (US);
A61N1/37512 (US);
C08F2/48 (EP,KR,RU,US);
C08F220/40 (KR,RU);
C08F220/44 (KR,RU);
C08K5/175 (KR);
C08L39/06 (KR);
A61L2430/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61L2430/32 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F226/10, C08F220/44, C08F220/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCH AKTIVE HYDROPHILE BIOPOLYMERE | [2018/45] | English: | ELECTRICALLY ACTIVE HYDROPHILIC BIO-POLYMERS | [2018/45] | French: | BIOPOLYMÈRES HYDROPHILES ÉLECTRIQUEMENT ACTIFS | [2018/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2018 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/45] | 26.07.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 12.02.2020 | AT | 12.02.2020 | CY | 12.02.2020 | EE | 12.02.2020 | FI | 12.02.2020 | HR | 12.02.2020 | LT | 12.02.2020 | LV | 12.02.2020 | MC | 12.02.2020 | MK | 12.02.2020 | MT | 12.02.2020 | RO | 12.02.2020 | RS | 12.02.2020 | SI | 12.02.2020 | SK | 12.02.2020 | SM | 12.02.2020 | TR | 12.02.2020 | BG | 12.05.2020 | GR | 13.05.2020 | IS | 12.06.2020 | PT | 05.07.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/27] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
CY | 12.02.2020 | ||
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
MT | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
TR | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
MC | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 12.02.2020 | |
EE | 12.02.2020 | ||
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SI | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | EE | 12.02.2020 | |
FI | 12.02.2020 | ||
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SK | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RO | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
SM | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
PT | 05.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LT | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
IS | 12.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
BG | 12.05.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
GR | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 12.02.2020 | |
HR | 12.02.2020 | ||
LV | 12.02.2020 | ||
RS | 12.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 12.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4668506 (BAWA RAJAN [US]) [A] 1-28 * column 1, lines 6-11 * * examples 1,2 *; | [A]US2009232871 (HITZ HANS [CH], et al) [A] 1-28 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0013] , [0039] * * example 12 *; | [A] - GUIMARD ET AL, "Conducting polymers in biomedical engineering", PROGRESS IN POLYMER SCIENCE, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20070807), vol. 32, no. 8-9, doi:10.1016/J.PROGPOLYMSCI.2007.05.012, ISSN 0079-6700, pages 876 - 921, XP022188826 [A] 1-21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.progpolymsci.2007.05.012 | by applicant | GB2479449 |