EP3356741 - AIR-CONDITIONING UNIT HAVING AN AIR/AIR PLATE-TYPE HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menerga GmbH Alexanderstrasse 69 45472 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2018/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Ralph Auf dem Busch 20 45968 Gladbeck / DE | [2018/32] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR Schumannstraße 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/12] |
Former [2018/32] | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16819438.9 | 19.12.2016 | [2018/32] | WO2016EP02128 | Priority number, date | DE20161000913 | 29.01.2016 Original published format: DE102016000913 | [2018/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2017129211 | Date: | 03.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3356741 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2017 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3356741 | Date: | 23.03.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F24F5/00, F24F12/00, F28F9/02, F28D5/02, F28D9/00, F28D21/00 | [2018/32] | CPC: |
F24F5/0035 (EP);
F24F12/006 (EP);
F28D21/0014 (EP);
F28D5/02 (EP);
F28D9/00 (EP);
F24F2012/007 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMAGERÄT MIT EINEM LUFT/LUFT-PLATTENWÄRMEÜBERTRAGER | [2018/32] | English: | AIR-CONDITIONING UNIT HAVING AN AIR/AIR PLATE-TYPE HEAT EXCHANGER | [2018/32] | French: | APPAREIL DE CLIMATISATION MUNI D'UN ÉCHANGEUR DE CHALEUR À PLAQUES AIR/AIR | [2018/32] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2018 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2018 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2018 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/32] | 04.05.2018 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2016 | AL | 23.03.2022 | CY | 23.03.2022 | CZ | 23.03.2022 | DK | 23.03.2022 | EE | 23.03.2022 | ES | 23.03.2022 | FI | 23.03.2022 | HR | 23.03.2022 | IT | 23.03.2022 | LT | 23.03.2022 | LV | 23.03.2022 | MC | 23.03.2022 | MK | 23.03.2022 | MT | 23.03.2022 | NL | 23.03.2022 | PL | 23.03.2022 | RO | 23.03.2022 | RS | 23.03.2022 | SE | 23.03.2022 | SI | 23.03.2022 | SK | 23.03.2022 | SM | 23.03.2022 | BG | 23.06.2022 | NO | 23.06.2022 | GR | 24.06.2022 | IS | 23.07.2022 | PT | 25.07.2022 | IE | 19.12.2022 | LU | 19.12.2022 | FR | 31.12.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.12.2016 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MC | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 19.12.2016 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
MK | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | HU | 19.12.2016 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
CY | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.12.2016 | |
AL | 23.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/52] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
FR | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.12.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
IT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SI | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
DK | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 23.03.2022 | |
CZ | 23.03.2022 | ||
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
IS | 23.07.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
PL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SK | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | CZ | 23.03.2022 | |
EE | 23.03.2022 | ||
ES | 23.03.2022 | ||
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 23.03.2022 | |
FI | 23.03.2022 | ||
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RO | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
SM | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
PT | 25.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
NL | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 23.03.2022 | |
HR | 23.03.2022 | ||
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
LV | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
GR | 24.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 23.03.2022 | |
LT | 23.03.2022 | ||
RS | 23.03.2022 | ||
SE | 23.03.2022 | ||
BG | 23.06.2022 | ||
NO | 23.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 23.03.2022 | |
NO | 23.06.2022 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102009048543 (MENERGA GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2905550 (VAN DER LEE ARTHUR [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP2618067 (BRINK CLIMATE SYSTEMS B V [NL]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP2423614 (LAING O ROURKE PLC [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US2002040575 | WO2005073656 |