Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3390432 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3390432



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(78)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1002
28.07.2021 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
05.10.2020 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
27.08.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
21.08.2020 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
31.07.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
31.07.2020 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
31.07.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
31.07.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
31.07.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.07.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.07.2020 Annexes in respect of a client data request Search / examination 1
20.07.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.07.2020 Submission concerning change of applicant's name Search / examination 1
24.03.2020 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.03.2020 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.03.2020 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.03.2020 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 123
24.03.2020 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 12
24.03.2020 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 123
02.03.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.03.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
02.03.2020 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
02.03.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
02.03.2020 Description Search / examination 3
02.03.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
02.03.2020 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
03.01.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
03.01.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
03.01.2020 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 89
03.01.2020 Claims Search / examination 3
03.01.2020 Description Search / examination 87
03.01.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
03.01.2020 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.09.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
02.09.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.08.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
08.02.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
08.02.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.02.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
08.02.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.09.2018 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
03.08.2018 Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
23.07.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
23.07.2018 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
10.07.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
10.07.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
10.07.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
10.07.2018 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
04.07.2018 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
30.04.2018 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
10.07.2017 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 137
22.06.2017 Sequence listing Search / examination -
22.06.2017 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.06.2017 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 129
24.02.2017 ISR: cited documents International Searching Authority 3
21.02.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII International Searching Authority 3
21.02.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet International Searching Authority 1
21.02.2017 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box International Searching Authority 2
10.02.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
10.02.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 1
10.02.2017 Incoming letter related to ISA procedure International Searching Authority 2
10.02.2017 Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
10.02.2017 Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP International Searching Authority 33
13.01.2017 Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable International Searching Authority 1
13.01.2017 Notification of receipt of Search copy International Searching Authority 1
23.12.2016 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
23.12.2016 Claims International Searching Authority 6
23.12.2016 Description International Searching Authority 89
23.12.2016 Drawings International Searching Authority 24
23.12.2016 Fee calculation sheet for an international application International Searching Authority 2
23.12.2016 Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 6
23.12.2016 Notification Concerning Documents Transmitted (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
23.12.2016 Notification Concerning Payment of Prescribed Fees (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 2
23.12.2016 Notification of the International Application Number and of the International Filing Date (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
23.12.2016 Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 4